EP3595925 - DRIVE SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE, METHOD FOR OPERATING A DRIVE SYSTEM, AND USE OF THE DRIVE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2020/04] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KILIC, Ahmet Herdweg 57 71032 Boeblingen / DE | 02 /
SHEN, Tunan Schelmenaeckerstrasse 10 71272 Renningen / DE | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 18710447.6 | 09.03.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018EP55854 | Priority number, date | DE201710204065 | 13.03.2017 Original published format: DE102017204065 | [2020/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018166900 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3595925 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/18 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
B60L58/18 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES ANTRIEBSSYSTEMS UND VERWENDUNG DES ANTRIEBSSYSTEMS | [2020/04] | English: | DRIVE SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE, METHOD FOR OPERATING A DRIVE SYSTEM, AND USE OF THE DRIVE SYSTEM | [2020/04] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PROPULSION POUR UN VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN SYSTÈME DE PROPULSION ET UTILISATION DU SYSTÈME DE PROPULSION | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 14.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/12] | 21.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JP2001185228 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1-3,10 * abstract * [Y] 4,5; | [XYI]JP2010003619 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,2,6-10 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014]; figure 1 * [Y] 4,5 [I] 3; | [Y]DE102010027857 (SB LIMOTIVE CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 4,5* paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0014]; figures 1,2,7 *; | [XI]DE112011101823T (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,6-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0010] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0055] * [I] 3,7-9; | [XI]DE112011102789T (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP [JP]) [X] 1,6,10 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0032] * [I] 2; | [Y]DE102012210908 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 4,5 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] * | by applicant | US2012091964 | US2013088201 |