EP3585275 - ANEURYSM DEVICE AND DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Synthes Products, Inc. 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, MA 02767 / US | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LORENZO, Juan 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, Massachusetts 02767 / US | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/01] | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18710599.4 | 23.02.2018 | [2020/01] | WO2018US19330 | Priority number, date | US201762462685P | 23.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762462685 P | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018156833 | Date: | 30.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3585275 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12, // A61B90/00, A61B17/00 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
A61B17/12172 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/12113 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/12031 (KR,US);
A61B17/12118 (US);
A61B17/1215 (US);
A61B17/12168 (US);
A61B17/12177 (US);
A61L31/18 (KR);
A61B17/1214 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00292 (US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/00915 (KR);
A61B2017/1205 (KR,US);
A61B2017/12054 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/12068 (KR,US);
A61B2090/3966 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/01] | A61B17/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Title | German: | ANEURYSMAVORRICHTUNG UND EINFÜHRUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/01] | English: | ANEURYSM DEVICE AND DELIVERY SYSTEM | [2020/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR ANÉVRISME ET SYSTÈME D'ADMINISTRATION | [2020/01] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 12.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/46] | 27.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2006064151 (GUTERMAN LEE R [US], et al) [X] 25,29-31 * paragraph [0055]; figures 6A-B * [A] 1-12 [I] 27,34; | [A]US2008281350 (SEPETKA IVAN [US], et al) [A] 1-12,25-34 * paragraph [0070]; figures 1A-4 * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0169] - paragraph [0194] *; | [XAI]US2010023046 (HEIDNER MATTHEW C [US], et al) [X] 25,29-31 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0014]; figures 1-6C * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0053] * [A] 1-12 [I] 27,33,34; | [XA]US2014200607 (SEPETKA IVAN [US], et al) [X] 25,27-31,33,34 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0080]; figures 10-32 * [A] 1-12; | [XAI]WO2015160721 (SEQUENT MEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 25,26,29-31 * paragraph [0116]; figures 6, 11, 26, 36-40 * * paragraph [0186] - paragraph [0189] * [A] 1-12 [I] 27,33,34; | [XAI]WO2015171268 (SEQUENT MEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 25,26,29-31,34 * paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0143]; figures 6, 11, 25-29, 55-60,75 * * paragraph [0256] * [A] 1-12[I] 27,33 | by applicant | US8998947 |