EP3610253 - MEANS FOR THE QUANTITATIVE DETERMINATION OF SODIUM CONCENTRATION AND CREATININE CONCENTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medizinische Universität Innsbruck Innrain 52 6020 Innsbruck / AT | For all designated states Universität Innsbruck Innrain 52 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2020/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINZ-ERIAN, Peter Frau Hittstraße 9a 6020 Innsbruck / AT | 02 /
FUHRMANN, Gerda Laura Olympiastr. 36/28 Axams 6094 / AT | [2020/08] | Representative(s) | Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/08] | Application number, filing date | 18710894.9 | 20.03.2018 | [2020/08] | WO2018EP56965 | Priority number, date | EP20170166332 | 12.04.2017 Original published format: EP 17166332 | [2020/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018188909 | Date: | 18.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3610253 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3610253 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/403, G01N33/543 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
G01N33/5438 (EP);
G01N27/333 (US);
A61B10/007 (US);
G01N27/327 (EP);
G01N27/3275 (US);
G01N33/493 (EP);
G01N33/70 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POTENTIOMETRISCHER SENSOR ZUR QUANTITATIVEN BESTIMMUNG VON NATRIUMKONZENTRATION UND KREATININKONZENTRATION | [2020/38] | English: | MEANS FOR THE QUANTITATIVE DETERMINATION OF SODIUM CONCENTRATION AND CREATININE CONCENTRATION | [2020/08] | French: | CAPTEUR POTENTIOMETRIQUE POUR LA DÉTERMINATION QUANTITATIVE DE LA CONCENTRATION DE SODIUM ET LA CONCENTRATION DE CRÉATININE | [2020/38] |
Former [2020/08] | MITTEL ZUR QUANTITATIVEN BESTIMMUNG VON NATRIUMKONZENTRATION UND KREATININKONZENTRATION | ||
Former [2020/08] | MOYEN DE DÉTERMINATION QUANTITATIVE D'UNE CONCENTRATION DE SODIUM ET D'UNE CONCENTRATION DE CRÉATININE | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 24.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.03.2018 | AL | 15.09.2021 | AT | 15.09.2021 | CY | 15.09.2021 | CZ | 15.09.2021 | DK | 15.09.2021 | EE | 15.09.2021 | FI | 15.09.2021 | HR | 15.09.2021 | LT | 15.09.2021 | LV | 15.09.2021 | MC | 15.09.2021 | MK | 15.09.2021 | MT | 15.09.2021 | NL | 15.09.2021 | PL | 15.09.2021 | RO | 15.09.2021 | RS | 15.09.2021 | SE | 15.09.2021 | SI | 15.09.2021 | SK | 15.09.2021 | SM | 15.09.2021 | BG | 15.12.2021 | NO | 15.12.2021 | GR | 16.12.2021 | IS | 15.01.2022 | PT | 17.01.2022 | IE | 20.03.2022 | LU | 20.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 20.03.2018 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
MK | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 20.03.2022 | ||
LU | 20.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
MK | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 20.03.2022 | ||
LU | 20.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 20.03.2022 | ||
LU | 20.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 20.03.2022 | ||
LU | 20.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 20.03.2022 | ||
LU | 20.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 15.09.2021 | |
NO | 15.12.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4713165 (CONOVER GILBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 10, line 11 - line 18 *; | [A]WO2016116175 (FUNDACIÓ INST CATALÀ D INVESTIGACIÓ QUÍMICA ICIQ [ES], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A] - P. HEINZ-ERIAN ET AL, "Decreased Urinary Sodium-to-urinary Creatinine Ratio Identifies Sodium Depletion in Pediatric Acute Gastroenteritis", KLINISCHE PAEDIATRIE., DE, (20160114), vol. 228, no. 01, doi:10.1055/s-0035-1559689, ISSN 0300-8630, pages 24 - 28, XP055388790 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-0035-1559689 | [A] - COATES A J ET AL, "Evaluation of salt supplementation in CF infants", JOURNAL OF CYSTIC FIBROSIS, ELSEVIER, NL, vol. 8, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.JCF.2009.08.006, ISSN 1569-1993, (20091201), pages 382 - 385, (20091002), XP026771074 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcf.2009.08.006 | [A] - TOMÀS GUINOVART ET AL, "Characterization of a new ionophore-based ion-selective electrode for the potentiometric determination of creatinine in urine", BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, NL, (20160810), vol. 87, doi:10.1016/j.bios.2016.08.025, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 587 - 592, XP055388382 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bios.2016.08.025 | [A] - ELMOSALLAMY ET AL, "New potentiometric sensors for creatinine", ANALYTICA CHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 564, no. 2, ISSN 0003-2670, (20060406), pages 253 - 257, (20060406), XP027913091 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - PHILLIPS ET AL, "Measurement of sodium ion concentration in undiluted urine with cation-selective polymeric membrane electrodes after the removal of interfering compounds", TALANTA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20071115), vol. 74, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.TALANTA.2007.06.011, ISSN 0039-9140, pages 255 - 264, XP022345666 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.talanta.2007.06.011 | by applicant | - UPADHYAY A; JABER BL; MADIAS NE, "Incidence and prevalence of hyponatremia", Am J Med, (20060000), vol. 1, pages S30 - S35 | - MORITZ ML; AYUS JC, "Maintenance intravenous fluids in acutely ill patients", N Engl J Med, (20150000), vol. 373, pages 1350 - 60 | - MORITZ ML; AYUS JC, "Disorders of water metabolism in children: hyponatremia and hypernatremia", Pediatr Rev, (20020000), vol. 23, pages 371 - 380 | - BLANK MC; BEDARF JR; RUSS M; GROSCH-OTT S; THIELE S; UNGER JK, "Total body Na(+)-depletion without hyponatremia can trigger overtraining-like symptoms with sleeping disorders and increasing blood pressure: explorative case and literature study", Med Hypotheses, (20120000), vol. 79, pages 799 - 804 | - HEINZ-ERIAN P; AKDAR Z; HAERTER B; WALDEGGER S; GINER T; SCHOLL-BUERGI S; MULLER T, "Decreased urinary-sodium-to-creatinine ratio identifies sodium depletion in pediatric acute gastroenteritis", Klin Padiatr, (20160000), vol. 228, doi:doi:10.1055/s-0035-1559689, pages 24 - 8, XP055388790 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-0035-1559689 | - COATES AJ; CROFTON PM; MARSHALL T, "Evaluation of salt supplementation in CF infants", J Cyst Fibr, (20090000), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jcf.2009.08.006, pages 382 - 5, XP026771074 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcf.2009.08.006 | - KNEPPER C; ELLEMUNTER H; EDER J; NIEDERMAYR K; HAERTER B; HOFER P; SCHOLL-BURGI S; MULLER T; HEINZ-ERIAN P, "Low sodium status in cystic fibrosis - as assessed by calculating fractional Na+ excretion - is associated with decreased growth parameters", J Cyst Fibr, (20160000), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jcf.2015.12.010, pages 400 - 5, XP029543257 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcf.2015.12.010 | - SAHAY M; SAHAY R, "Hyponatremia: a practical approach", Indian J Endocrinol Metab, (20140000), vol. 18, pages 760 - 771 | - WASSNER SJ; KULIN HE, "Diminished linear growth associated with chronic salt depletion", Clin Pediatr, (19900000), vol. 29, pages 719 - 21 | - RODRIGUEZ MJ; ALCARAZ A; SOLANA MJ et al., "Neurological symptoms in hospitalized patients: do we assess hyponatremia with sufficient care?", Acta Paediatr, (20140000), vol. 103, pages e7 - el0 | - CORONA G; GUILIANI C; PARENTI G et al., "Moderate hyponatremia is associated with increased risk of mortality: evidence from a meta-analysis", PLOS ONE, (20130000), vol. 8, page e80451 | - MORITZ ML; AYUS JC, "New aspects in the pathogenesis, prevention and treatment of hyponatremic encephalopathy in children", Pediatr Nephrol, (20100000), vol. 25, pages 1225 - 38, XP019850347 | - "Messung von Natrium", THOMAS L, Labor und Diagnose, pages 295 - 303 | - MAAS AH, "IFCC reference methods for measurement of pH, gases and electrolytes in blood: reference materials", Eur J Clin Chem Clin Biochem, (19910000), vol. 29, pages 253 - 261 | - RANDVIR EP; BANKS CE, "Analytical methods for quantifying creatinine within biological media", Sensors & Actuators B, (20130000), vol. 183, doi:doi:10.1016/j.snb.2013.03.103, pages 239 - 52, XP028549887 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.snb.2013.03.103 | - VASHIST SK; LUPPA PB; YEO L Y; OZCAN A; LUONG JHT, "Emerging Technologies for Next-Generation Point-of-Care Testing", Trends in Biotechnology, (20150000), vol. 33, no. 11, pages 692 - 705 | - YETISEN AK; AKRAM MS; LOWE CR, "Paper-based microfluidic point-of-care diagnostic devices", Lab Chip, (20130000), vol. 13, pages 2210 - 52 | - WEBER JA.; ZANTEN VAN AP, "Interferences in current methods for measurements of creatinine", Clin. Chem., (19910000), vol. 37/5, pages 695 - 700 | - SYAL K.; BANERJEE D.; SRINIVASAN A., "Creatinine estimation and interference", Ind J Clin Biochem, (20130000), vol. 28, no. 2, pages 210 - 211 | - C.S. PUNDIR; CS. SANDEEP; YADAV S; KUMAR A, "Creatinine sensors", TRAC, (20130000), vol. 50, pages 2 - 52 | - SHEPHARD MDS, "Point-of-Care Testing and Creatinine Measurement", Clin Biochem Rev, (20110000), vol. 32, pages 109 - 114 | - YAFIA M; SHUKLA S; NAJJARAN H, "Fabrication of digital microfluidic deviceson flexible paper-based and rigid substrates via screen printing", J. Micromech. Microeng., (20150000), vol. 25, pages 1 - 11 | - WHITESIDES GM, "Electrochemical sensing in paper-based microfluidic devices", Lab Chip, (20100000), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1039/B917150A, pages 477 - 483, XP055210143 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B917150A | - SCHRIER RW, "Diagnostic value of urinary sodium, chloride, urea and flow", J Am Soc Nephrol, (20110000), vol. 22, pages 1610 - 1613 | - ESPINEL CH, "The FENa test. Use in the differential diagnosis of acute renal failure", JAMA, (19760000), vol. 236, pages 579 - 581 | - WINKLER SS; THOMASSON DM; SHERWOOD K; PERMAN WH, "Regional T2 and sodium concentration estimates in the normal human brain by sodium-23 MR imaging at 1.5 T", J Comput Assist Tomogr, (19890000), vol. 13, pages 561 - 5 |