EP3600641 - METHOD FOR PREPARING CAPSULES COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE WATER-SOLUBLE OR HYDROPHILIC SUBSTANCE AND CAPSULES OBTAINED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calyxia 2 Avenue des Orangers 94380 Bonneuil-sur-Marne / FR | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMOULIN, Damien Calyxia 2 avenue des Orangers 94380 BONNEUIL-SUR-MARNE / FR | 02 /
MOUSNIER, Ludivine Résidence les Hauts de Villebon Bat 1 Apt 4 1 rue Marcel Pagnol 91140 Villebon Sur Yvette / FR | 03 /
SADAOUI, Alicia 16 rue Louis Pergaud 94700 Maisons Alfort / FR | 04 /
WALTERS, Jamie 21 rue Saint-Jacques 75005 Paris / FR | [2020/15] |
Former [2020/06] | 01 /
DEMOULIN, Damien 214 avenue du Maine 75014 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
MOUSNIER, Ludivine Résidence les Hauts de Villebon Bat 1 Apt 4 1 rue Marcel Pagnol 91140 Villebon Sur Yvette / FR | |||
03 /
SADAOUI, Alicia 16 rue Louis Pergaud 94700 Maisons Alfort / FR | |||
04 /
WALTERS, Jamie 21 rue Saint-Jacques 75005 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18710903.8 | 20.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018EP57028 | Priority number, date | FR20170052331 | 21.03.2017 Original published format: FR 1752331 | [2020/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018172360 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3600641 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/14, C08F2/48, F28D20/02, B01J13/18 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
B01J13/14 (EP,KR);
B01J13/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2/22 (US);
C08F2/46 (US);
C08F2/48 (EP,KR);
F28D20/023 (EP,KR);
Y02E60/14 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | B01J13/14, B01F3/08, C08F2/48, F28D20/02, B01J13/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KAPSELN MIT MINDESTENS EINER WASSERLÖSLICHEN ODER HYDROPHILEN SUBSTANZ UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE KAPSELN | [2020/06] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING CAPSULES COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE WATER-SOLUBLE OR HYDROPHILIC SUBSTANCE AND CAPSULES OBTAINED THEREFROM | [2020/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE CAPSULES COMPRENANT AU MOINS UNE SUBSTANCE HYDROSOLUBLE OU HYDROPHILE ET CAPSULES OBTENUES | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 19.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2004234738 (JAHNS EKKEHARD [DE], et al); | [A]US2008318048 (AMRHEIN PATRICK [DE], et al); | [XI]US2009289216 (JUNG MARC RUDOLF [DE], et al); | [XI]US2016144329 (WESNER JOHN CHRISTOPHER [US], et al); | [A]US2016145459 (KLEIN REGINA [DE], et al) | by applicant | US587714 | US5938581 | US6335315 | FR3004641 | FR20160061787 |