EP3603131 - TECHNIQUES AND APPARATUSES FOR SIGNAL QUALITY MEASUREMENTS FOR NARROWBAND INTERNET OF THINGS (NB-IOT) DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHATTAD, Kapil 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
RICO ALVARINO, Alberto 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
WANG, Xiao feng 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 04 /
SRIDHARAN, Arvind 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 05 /
XU, Hao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2021/35] |
Former [2020/06] | Hohgardt, Martin Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18710978.0 | 28.02.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018US20212 | Priority number, date | IN201741010252 | 23.03.2017 Original published format: IN201741010252 | US201715714285 | 25.09.2017 Original published format: US201715714285 | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018175075 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3603131 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3603131 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26, H04W24/10, H04W48/12, H04W52/32, H04W4/70 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
H04W4/70 (EP,US);
H04B17/309 (US);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04W48/12 (EP,US);
H04W52/325 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | H04W4/70, H04W4/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TECHNIKEN UND VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR SIGNALQUALITÄTSMESSUNGEN FÜR VORRICHTUNG FÜR SCHMALBANDIGES INTERNET DER DINGE (NB-IOT) | [2020/06] | English: | TECHNIQUES AND APPARATUSES FOR SIGNAL QUALITY MEASUREMENTS FOR NARROWBAND INTERNET OF THINGS (NB-IOT) DEVICES | [2020/06] | French: | TECHNIQUES ET APPAREILS POUR MESURES DE QUALITÉ DE SIGNAUX DESTINÉS À DES DISPOSITIFS DE L'INTERNET DES OBJETS À BANDE ÉTROITE (NB-IOT) | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 01.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2018 | AL | 01.09.2021 | AT | 01.09.2021 | CY | 01.09.2021 | CZ | 01.09.2021 | DK | 01.09.2021 | EE | 01.09.2021 | FI | 01.09.2021 | HR | 01.09.2021 | LT | 01.09.2021 | LV | 01.09.2021 | MC | 01.09.2021 | MK | 01.09.2021 | MT | 01.09.2021 | PL | 01.09.2021 | RO | 01.09.2021 | RS | 01.09.2021 | SI | 01.09.2021 | SK | 01.09.2021 | SM | 01.09.2021 | TR | 01.09.2021 | BG | 01.12.2021 | NO | 01.12.2021 | GR | 02.12.2021 | IS | 01.01.2022 | PT | 03.01.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | IE | 28.02.2022 | LU | 28.02.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 28.02.2018 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
MK | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
TR | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
IE | 28.02.2022 | ||
LU | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 28.02.2018 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
MK | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
IE | 28.02.2022 | ||
LU | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
MK | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
IE | 28.02.2022 | ||
LU | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
IE | 28.02.2022 | ||
LU | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
IE | 28.02.2022 | ||
LU | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
IE | 28.02.2022 | ||
LU | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
LU | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 01.09.2021 | |
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 01.09.2021 | |
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 01.09.2021 | |
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 01.09.2021 | |
NO | 01.12.2021 | Cited in | International search | [I] - ZTE, "Remaining issues on NB-RS for NB-IoT", vol. RAN WG1, no. Sophia Antipolis, FRANCE; 20160322 - 20160324, (20160316), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-161864 NB-RS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/LTE_NB-IoT_1603/Docs/, (20160316), XP051080981 [I] 1-30 * the whole document * | [I] - SAMSUNG, "Remaining Issues of Reference Signal Design", vol. RAN WG1, no. Sophia Antipolis, FRANCE; 20160322 - 20160324, (20160316), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-161928 NB-RS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/LTE_NB-IoT_1603/Docs/, (20160316), XP051081045 [I] 1-30 * the whole document * | [I] - INTEL CORPORATION, "NB-IoT Reference Signal Design", vol. RAN WG1, no. St Julian's, Malta; 20160215 - 20160219, (20160214), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-160412 - INTEL NB-IOT NB-RS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20160214), XP051053749 [I] 1-30 * the whole document * |