EP3571495 - SAMPLE INSPECTION APPARATUS EMPLOYING A DIFFRACTION DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Nottingham Trent University 50 Shakespeare Street Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG1 4FQ / GB | For all designated states Cranfield University College Road Cranfield, Bedfordshire MK43 0AL / GB | [2023/06] |
Former [2019/48] | For all designated states The Nottingham Trent University Clifton Lane Nottingham NG11 8NS / GB | ||
For all designated states Cranfield University College Road Cranfield, Bedfordshire MK43 0AL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVANS, Paul School of Science and Technology Nottingham Trent University Clifton Campus Clifton Lane Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG11 8NS / GB | 02 /
ROGERS, Keith Cranfield University Shrivenham Campus Swindon, Wiltshire SN6 8LA / GB | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Scintilla Intellectual Property Ltd Suite 2.1 145 St. Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5JF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/48] | Scintilla Intellectual Property Ltd The Centrum Building 38 Queen Street Glasgow G1 3DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 18711620.7 | 22.02.2018 | [2019/48] | WO2018GB50467 | Priority number, date | GB20170003077 | 25.02.2017 Original published format: GB 201703077 | GB20170003078 | 25.02.2017 Original published format: GB 201703078 | GB20170003079 | 25.02.2017 Original published format: GB 201703079 | GB20170003080 | 25.02.2017 Original published format: GB 201703080 | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018154308 | Date: | 30.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3571495 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3571495 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/20008, G01N23/205 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
G01N23/20008 (EP,US);
G01N23/205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] |
Former [2019/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEUGUNGSDETEKTOR VERWENDENDE PROBENINSPEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/51] | English: | SAMPLE INSPECTION APPARATUS EMPLOYING A DIFFRACTION DETECTOR | [2019/48] | French: | APPAREIL D'INSPECTION D'ÉCHANTILLON UTILISANT UN DÉTECTEUR DE DIFFRACTION | [2019/48] |
Former [2019/48] | PROBENINSPEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT ANWENDUNG EINES BEUGUNGSDETEKTORS | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 23.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.12.2022 | 29.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.03.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.07.2023 | CZ | 19.07.2023 | DK | 19.07.2023 | EE | 19.07.2023 | ES | 19.07.2023 | FI | 19.07.2023 | HR | 19.07.2023 | IT | 19.07.2023 | LT | 19.07.2023 | LV | 19.07.2023 | NL | 19.07.2023 | PL | 19.07.2023 | RO | 19.07.2023 | RS | 19.07.2023 | SE | 19.07.2023 | SI | 19.07.2023 | SK | 19.07.2023 | SM | 19.07.2023 | NO | 19.10.2023 | GR | 20.10.2023 | IS | 19.11.2023 | PT | 20.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
IT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 19.07.2023 | |
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 19.07.2023 | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO2008149078 (UNIV NOTTINGHAM TRENT [GB], et al) [YD] 1-7 * page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph 1 - page 9, paragraph 5 * * page 17, paragraph 3 - page 18, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,11 *; | [Y] - JOEL A GREENBERG, "Coded apertures for faster x-ray scatter imaging", SPIE NEWSROOM, (20160810), doi:10.1117/2.1201607.006646, pages 1 - 4, XP055480994 [Y] 1-7 * page 1, column left, paragraph 3 - column right, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/2.1201607.006646 |