Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3701007 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201880069311 EP18712855 EP2018056854W US201816759030



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11760968Global Dossier 19.09.2023B2
US2020277562 03.09.2020A1
Priority number Date
DE102017124840 24.10.2017
WO2018EP56854 19.03.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN111278964BGlobal Dossier 16.08.2024B
CN111278964 12.06.2020A
Priority number Date
DE102017124840 24.10.2017
WO2018EP56854 19.03.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3701007Global Dossier 02.09.2020A1
Priority number Date
DE102017124840 24.10.2017
WO2018EP56854 19.03.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2762749 22.12.2021C2
RU2020115634 25.11.2021A3
RU2020115634 25.11.2021A
Priority number Date
DE102017124840 24.10.2017
WO2018EP56854 19.03.2018
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2019081069Global Dossier 02.05.2019A1
Priority number Date
DE102017124840 24.10.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102017124840 13.12.2018B3
Priority number Date
DE102017124840 24.10.2017