EP3606724 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING RECYCLED PLASTIC COMPOSITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NO | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dierickx Visschers NV Baaikensstraat 1 9240 Zele / BE | [2024/14] |
Former [2020/07] | For all designated states Dierickx Visschers NV Baalkenstraat 1 9240 Zele / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERHAERT, Koen Nikelaan 35 2430 Laakdal / BE | 02 /
GALLE, Rudy Stationsstraat 34 9750 Zingem / BE | 03 /
DIERICKX VISSCHERS, Jules Baaikensstraat 1 9750 Zele / BE | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Brantsandpatents bv Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24 9051 Ghent / BE | [2024/06] |
Former [2020/07] | Brantsandpatents bvba Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24 9051 Ghent / BE | Application number, filing date | 18712933.3 | 03.04.2018 | [2020/07] | WO2018EP58460 | Priority number, date | EP20170164582 | 03.04.2017 Original published format: EP 17164582 | [2020/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018185085 | Date: | 11.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3606724 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3606724 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B29C51/14, B32B27/02, B32B27/12, B32B37/24, B32B5/28, B32B17/04 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
B29B15/127 (EP);
B32B5/08 (EP,US);
B29C51/145 (EP,US);
B32B27/02 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B32B27/302 (EP);
B32B27/304 (EP);
B32B27/308 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B37/24 (EP,US);
B32B5/022 (EP);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
B32B5/28 (EP);
B32B7/04 (EP);
B32B7/08 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
B29K2101/12 (US);
B29K2105/26 (US);
B32B2255/02 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
B32B2255/24 (EP);
B32B2255/26 (EP);
B32B2260/046 (EP);
B32B2262/023 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0261 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0276 (EP,US);
B32B2262/06 (EP);
B32B2262/062 (EP);
B32B2262/065 (EP,US);
B32B2262/067 (EP);
B32B2262/08 (EP,US);
B32B2262/101 (EP,US);
B32B2262/103 (US);
B32B2262/14 (EP);
B32B2270/00 (EP);
B32B2272/00 (EP,US);
B32B2305/30 (EP);
B32B2305/70 (US);
B32B2307/306 (EP,US);
B32B2307/50 (EP);
B32B2307/554 (EP,US);
B32B2307/558 (EP,US);
B32B2307/714 (EP);
B32B2307/7145 (EP,US);
B32B2307/734 (EP,US);
B32B2307/738 (EP,US);
B32B2439/62 (EP);
B32B2439/66 (US);
B32B2471/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON RECYCELTEM KUNSTSTOFFVERBUNDSTOFF | [2020/07] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING RECYCLED PLASTIC COMPOSITE | [2020/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSITE DE PLASTIQUE RECYCLÉ | [2023/45] |
Former [2020/07] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSITE EN PLASTIQUE RECYCLÉ | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 04.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NO | 07.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4128927 (LIGNOTOCK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2; claims 1-7,9,12,14-16,18 *; | [A]US5298319 (DONAHUE JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 2; claims 1,2,3,10,11,12,17,18 *; | [XAY]US2014124972 (BURGIN THOMAS [CH], et al) [X] 12-15 * paragraphs [0016] , [0019] , [0021] , [0025] , [0027] , [0032] , [0033] , [0039] , [0042] - [0046] - [0048] , [0054] , [0076] , [0077] , [0078] , [0088] - [0091] * [A] 2,9 [Y] 1,3-8,10,11; | [XAY]WO2015175761 (ZEPHYROS INC [US]) [X] 12,15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0015] , [0000] , [0019] , [0020] , [0034] , [0039] , [0040] , [0042] , [0044] , [0048]; figures 1,2; claims 1,4,5,9,12,17,18,20,21 * [A] 2,9,13,14 [Y] 1,3-8,10,11; | [XA]US2016068668 (PELTOLA PIIA [FI], et al) [X] 12 * paragraphs [0047] , [0050] , [0065] , [0159] , [0161] , [0163] , [0172] , [0179] , [0193] - [0194]; claims 1,2,4,8 * [A] 1-11,13-15; | [A]KR20160136980 (SINCO T&C CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0011] , [0014] , [0020] , [0024] , [0026] , [0029] , [0032]; figure 2a; claims 1-7 * | Examination | DE4128927 | US5298319 | US2014124972 | WO2015175761 | US2016068668 | KR20160136980 |