Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11261544 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2022 | B2 | US2020002849 | 02.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762472862 | 17.03.2017 | US201762478163 | 29.03.2017 | US201816486521 | 07.03.2018 | WO2018US21282 | 07.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102533429B | Global Dossier | 22.05.2023 | B1 | KR20190126375 | 11.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762472862 | 17.03.2017 | US201762478163 | 29.03.2017 | WO2018US21282 | 07.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7181888B | Global Dossier | 01.12.2022 | B2 | JP2020512451 | 23.04.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762472862 | 17.03.2017 | US201762478163 | 29.03.2017 | WO2018US21282 | 07.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110418862B | Global Dossier | 19.08.2022 | B | CN110418862 | 05.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762472862 | 17.03.2017 | US201762478163 | 29.03.2017 | WO2018US21282 | 07.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3596260 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762472862 | 17.03.2017 | US201762478163 | 29.03.2017 | WO2018US21282 | 07.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR111332 | 03.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762472862 | 17.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112019019236 | 06.02.2024 | B1 | BR112019019236 | 14.04.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201762472862 | 17.03.2017 | US201762478163 | 29.03.2017 | WO2018US21282 | 07.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2019011052 | 17.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762472862 | 17.03.2017 | US201762478163 | 29.03.2017 | WO2018US21282 | 07.03.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018169738 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762472862 | 17.03.2017 | US201762478163 | 29.03.2017 |