EP3596260 - POLYMERS FOR USE IN FIBERS AND NONWOVEN FABRICS, ARTICLES THEREOF, AND COMPOSITES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAH, Viraj 230 Abner Jackson Parkway Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | 02 /
LIN, Yijian 230 Abner Jackson Parkway Herbert H. Dow Building/4B145 Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | 03 /
WEVERS, Ronald Herbert H. Dowweg 5 P. O. Box 48 4530AA Terneuzen / NL | 04 /
CONG, Rongjuan 230 Abner Jackson Parkway Herbert H. Dow Building/3A141 Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | 05 /
DEMIRORS, Mehmet 230 Abner Jackson Parkway HHD Building/4B124 Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 18713100.8 | 07.03.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018US21282 | Priority number, date | US201762472862P | 17.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762472862 P | US201762478163P | 29.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762478163 P | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018169738 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3596260 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/30, D04H1/4291, C08F210/16, C08F4/6592, C08F4/64, C08F2/06 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
D01F6/30 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2/06 (KR);
C08F210/14 (KR);
C08F210/16 (KR,US);
C08F4/64193 (KR);
C08F4/65908 (EP,KR);
C08F4/65912 (EP,KR);
C08F4/6592 (KR);
D01D5/34 (EP,KR,US);
D01F8/06 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/4291 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/56 (EP,KR,US);
D04H3/007 (EP,KR,US);
D04H3/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2500/02 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F2/06 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/64193 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/6592 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/02, C08F2500/06, C08F2500/17 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Title | German: | POLYMERE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN FASERN UND VLIESSTOFFEN, ARTIKEL DARAUS UND VERBUNDSTOFFE DARAUS | [2020/04] | English: | POLYMERS FOR USE IN FIBERS AND NONWOVEN FABRICS, ARTICLES THEREOF, AND COMPOSITES THEREOF | [2020/04] | French: | POLYMÈRES DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS DANS DES FIBRES ET DES NON-TISSÉS, ARTICLES ASSOCIÉS ET COMPOSITES ASSOCIÉS | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 14.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2010113706 (CROWTHER DONNA J [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0149] * * example - * [I] 5,8-13; | [A]WO2016003879 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [A] 1-13* comparative example C11; table 6; page 57 * | by applicant | US4798081 | US5008204 | WO9303093 | US5292845 | US7498282 | US8372931 | WO2015191066 | - WILLIAMS; WARD, "Polym. Letters", J. Polym. Sci., (19680000), vol. 6, page 621 | - ZIMM, B.H., J. Chem. Phys., (19480000), vol. 16, page 1099 | - MONRABAL et al., Macromol. Symp., (20070000), vol. 257, pages 71 - 79 | - WILD et al., Journal of Polymer Science, Poly. Phys. Ed., (19820000), vol. 20, page 441 | - L. D. CADY, "The Role of Comonomer Type and Distribution in LLDPE Product Performance", SPE Regional Technical Conference, (19851001), pages 107 - 119 | - J. C. RANDALL, Rev. Macromol. Chem. Phys., vol. C29, pages 201 - 317 |