14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
08.09.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
08.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
11.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
28.05.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
07.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
26.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
15.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
19.06.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
17.06.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.06.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.06.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.03.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.03.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
06.03.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
24.01.2020 |
Change - German title |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
24.01.2020 |
Change - French title |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
10.01.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
10.01.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
10.01.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
16.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.10.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.10.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.10.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
04.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.09.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|