Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11262267 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2022 | B2 | US2021102860 | 08.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17164570 | 03.04.2017 | WO2018EP58306 | 30.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110799822B | Global Dossier | 07.12.2021 | B | CN110799822 | 14.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | EP17164570 | 03.04.2017 | WO2018EP58306 | 30.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3607291 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2020 | B1 | EP3607291 | 12.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17164570 | 03.04.2017 | WO2018EP58306 | 30.03.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018185029 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17164570 | 03.04.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3385692 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17164570 | 03.04.2017 |