EP3596394 - SELF-CENTERING MECHANISM FOR AN APPLIANCE KNOB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products, Inc. 10200 David Taylor Drive Charlotte, NC 28262 / US | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOUFER, Paul 3021 Heathcroft Court Charlotte, North Carolina 28269 / US | 02 /
CARPENTER, Kevin 1012 Copeland Oaks Drive Morrisville, North Carolina 27560 / US | 03 /
DEMERS, Michelle 1012 Copeland Oaks Drive Morrisville, North Carolina 27560 / US | 04 /
CLEMENS, David A. 115 S. Fields Circle Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27516 / US | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/04] | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents 105 45 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 18713362.4 | 13.03.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018IB51676 | Priority number, date | US201715457625 | 13.03.2017 Original published format: US201715457625 | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018167674 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3596394 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F24C7/08, G05G1/08, G05G5/04, G05G5/05 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
G05G5/05 (EP,US);
F24C7/08 (EP,US);
G05G1/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Title | German: | SELBSTZENTRIERENDER MECHANISMUS FÜR EINEN GERÄTEKNOPF | [2020/04] | English: | SELF-CENTERING MECHANISM FOR AN APPLIANCE KNOB | [2020/04] | French: | MÉCANISME D'AUTO-CENTRAGE POUR UN BOUTON D'APPAREIL | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 14.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/38] | 29.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2656178 (HUGHES JR ARTHUR C) [A] 1-16 * figures 1-2; claim 1 *; | [A]US2954707 (KALOUS LEO R) [A] 1-16 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2312787 (METHODE ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * figures 3-6 *; | [A]DE202011103276U (MEGATRON ELEKTRONIK AG & CO INDUSTRIETECHNIK KG [DE]) [A] 1-16* figure - *; | [A]WO2013144456 (SARTORIUS BIOHIT LIQUID HANDLING OY [FI]) [A] 1-16 * figures 1-2 * |