Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3592347
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
03.01.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.08.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.06.2023 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.03.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.02.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.02.2023 |
First examination report |
|
17.01.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.05.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
15.05.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
04.05.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.12.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] |
13.12.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
13.12.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] |
18.11.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.11.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.10.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.10.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
08.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|