Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021251869 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815915777 | 08.03.2018 | GB201703734 | 08.03.2017 | GB201703768 | 09.03.2017 | US202017104155 | 25.11.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20190134652 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP55772 | 08.03.2018 | GB201703734 | 08.03.2017 | GB201703768 | 09.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024050707 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019548888 | 08.03.2018 | WO2018EP55772 | 08.03.2018 | GB201703734 | 08.03.2017 | GB201703768 | 09.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2020510036 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP55772 | 08.03.2018 | GB201703734 | 08.03.2017 | GB201703768 | 09.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110709077 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP55772 | 08.03.2018 | GB201703734 | 08.03.2017 | GB201703768 | 09.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3055669 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP55772 | 08.03.2018 | GB201703734 | 08.03.2017 | GB201703768 | 09.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3592347 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP55772 | 08.03.2018 | GB201703734 | 08.03.2017 | GB201703768 | 09.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201703734D0 | 19.04.2017 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201703734 | 08.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201703768D0 | 26.04.2017 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201703768 | 09.03.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018162645 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201703734 | 08.03.2017 | GB201703768 | 09.03.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018256471 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201703734 | 08.03.2017 | GB201703768 | 09.03.2017 |