EP3596717 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INDICATING BUILDING FIRE DANGER RATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation 13995 Pasteur Boulevard Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US | [2024/23] |
Former [2020/04] | For all designated states Carrier Corporation 17900 Beeline Highway Jupiter, FL 33478 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARBALLIDO VILLAVERDE, Berta Calle Las Lilas 4 Villaseca De Laciana 24140 Villaseca De Laciana, Leon / ES | 02 /
DE PAZ ALBEROLA, Rodolfo Calle del té, 5 03559 Alicante / ES | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 18715398.6 | 15.03.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018US22585 | Priority number, date | US201762471638P | 15.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762471638 P | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018170229 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3596717 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G08B31/00, G08B7/06, G08B17/00 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
G08B7/066 (EP);
G08B29/188 (US);
G08B17/00 (EP);
G08B17/117 (US);
G08B21/02 (US);
G08B31/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGE VON GEBÄUDEBRANDGEFAHREINSTUFUNGEN | [2020/04] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INDICATING BUILDING FIRE DANGER RATINGS | [2020/04] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'INDICATION D'ÉVALUATIONS DE RISQUE D'INCENDIE DANS UN BÂTIMENT | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 27.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005128071 (FALTESEK ANTHONY E [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] * * figures 11,2,3.1 - 3.3 * * abstract * * sentences 2,3, paragraph 28 * * paragraph [0040] *; | [A]US2008248450 (LI QING [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * sentences 1-3, paragraph 2 * * sentence 1, paragraph 6 * * paragraph [0023] * * sentences 1,2, paragraph 52 * * page 1 *; | [X]WO2010034547 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * figure 1 * * page 2, lines 23-26 * * page 6, lines 15-18 * * page 11, lines 13,14, 21-32 * * page 9, lines 25,26 * * page 10, lines 11-13,16-20 * * page 12, lines 16,32-35 * * Title *; | [A]US2014290103 (KYBERD BRADLEY ROBERT [AU]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** figures 1,2 * |