EP3607069 - PRODUCTS AND COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: AL | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silence Therapeutics GmbH Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10 13125 Berlin / DE | [2022/44] |
Former [2020/07] | For all designated states Silence Therapeutics GmbH Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10 13125 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUPTMANN, Judith c/o Silence Therapeutics GmbH Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10 13125 Berlin / DE | 02 /
SAMARSKY, Dmitry c/o Silence Therapeutics GmbH Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10 13125 Berlin / DE | 03 /
FRAUENDORF, Christian Zimbelstr. 67 13127 Berlin / DE | [2020/09] |
Former [2020/07] | 01 /
HAUPTMANN, Judith c/o Silence Therapeutics GmbH Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10 13125 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
SAMARSKY, Dmitry c/o Silence Therapeutics GmbH Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10 13125 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
FRAUENDORF, Christian Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10 13125 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/44] |
Former [2020/07] | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | Application number, filing date | 18715706.0 | 05.04.2018 | [2020/07] | WO2018EP58766 | Priority number, date | EP20170165129 | 05.04.2017 Original published format: EP 17165129 | GB20170007203 | 05.05.2017 Original published format: GB 201707203 | GB20170008397 | 25.05.2017 Original published format: GB 201708397 | EP20170201352 | 13.11.2017 Original published format: EP 17201352 | [2020/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018185241 | Date: | 11.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3607069 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3607069 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K31/713 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
A61K31/713 (EP);
A61K47/549 (EP);
C07H21/00 (EP);
C07H21/02 (EP);
C07H21/04 (EP);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
C12N2310/313 (EP,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP);
C12N2310/321 (EP,US);
C12N2310/322 (US);
C12N2310/344 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRODUKTE UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2020/07] | English: | PRODUCTS AND COMPOSITIONS | [2020/07] | French: | PRODUITS ET COMPOSITIONS | [2020/07] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 05.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22202294.9 / EP4219713 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.2023
01.08.2023
ADMISSIBLE Ammelburg, Moritz HighLight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE Opponent's representative Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.2023
01.08.2023
ADMISSIBLE Ammelburg, Mortitz HighLight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE Opponent's representative Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [2023/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.2023
01.08.2023
ADMISSIBLE Ammelburg, Mortitz HighLight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | 17.08.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.12.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SM | 02.11.2022 | [2024/31] |
Former [2023/37] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | SM | 02.11.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005080246 (ALLERSON CHARLES [US], et al); | [X]WO2007112414 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2009002944 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2010078536 (RXI PHARMACEUTICALS CORP [US], et al); | [X]WO2013074974 (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]); | [X]WO2013075035 (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS [US]); | [X]WO2016085852 (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]); | [X]WO2016161388 (UNIV MASSACHUSETTS [US]); | [X]WO2017030973 (UNIV MASSACHUSETTS [US]); | Opposition | WO2007022369 | WO2007112414 | WO2009002944 | WO2009073809 | WO2010039548 | WO2012037254 | WO2013074974 | WO2015006740 | WO2015188194 | WO2016085852 | WO2017059223 | WO2017214112 | WO2018027106 | WO2018132432 | WO2018140920 | WO2018185241 | WO2019051402 | WO2019055633 |