EP3593075 - WALL-MOUNTED RADIANT COOLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Equoclima Srl Via Mazzini 10 26030 Gabbioneta Binanuova / IT | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUINZANINI, Roberto Cascina Cigola Martinoni 25020 Cigole / IT | 02 /
GAVIZZOLI, Massimo Via Chioderolo 6 25134 Brescia / IT | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | Mari, Marco Giovanni, et al Ing. Mari & C. S.r.l. Via Garibotti, 3 26100 Cremona / IT | [2020/03] | Application number, filing date | 18715986.8 | 07.03.2018 | [2020/03] | WO2018IT50036 | Priority number, date | IT20170025518 | 08.03.2017 Original published format: IT201700025518 | [2020/03] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018163225 | Date: | 13.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3593075 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3593075 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F28F1/16, F28D1/04 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
F28D1/04 (EP,US);
F24F13/222 (EP,US);
F24F5/0089 (EP,US);
F28F1/16 (EP,US);
F28F17/005 (EP,US);
F24F2221/17 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] | Extension states | BA | 17.09.2019 | ME | 17.09.2019 | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WANDMONTIERTE STRAHLUNGSKÜHLVORRICHTUNG | [2020/03] | English: | WALL-MOUNTED RADIANT COOLING DEVICE | [2020/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REFROIDISSEMENT PAR RAYONNEMENT, À MONTAGE MURAL | [2020/03] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 17.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 14.04.2021 | [2022/47] | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1070656 (LICENTIA) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE724762 (LINDE EISMASCH AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9304461U (INGENIEURSBÜRO TIMMER GMBH) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5966959 (STEWART JEFFREY L [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP1739365 (FROG S R L GMBH [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE202011003135U (KOEHLER MARIO [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015338108 (MURAKAMI TAKANOBU [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP3009749 (ASAHI KASEI HOMES CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2017009951 (ECO FACTORY CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * |