EP3609995 - METHOD FOR PROCESSING A LIQUID SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states cytena Bioprocess Solutions co., Ltd. 7F-6., No. 495, GuangFu S. Road Xinyi District Taipei City 110 / TW | [2020/38] |
Former [2020/08] | For all designated states CYTENA GMBH Neuer Messplatz 3 79108 Freiburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÖNDUBE, Jonas c/o cytena GmbH Neuer Messplatz 3 79108 Freiburg / DE | 02 /
CHENGHAN, Tsai Gartenstraße 13 79098 Freiburg / DE | 03 /
GROSS, Andre Sautierstraße 67 79104 Freiburg / DE | 04 /
ZIMMERMANN, Stefan General-von-Holzing Straße 57 79283 Bollschweil / DE | 05 /
KOLTAY, Peter Tannebergstraße 10a 79117 Freiburg / DE | [2020/12] |
Former [2020/08] | 01 /
SCHÖNDUBE, Jonas Eschholzstraße 48 79115 Freiburg / DE | ||
02 /
CHENGHAN, Tsai Gartenstraße 13 79098 Freiburg / DE | |||
03 /
GROSS, Andre Sautierstraße 67 79104 Freiburg / DE | |||
04 /
ZIMMERMANN, Stefan General-von-Holzing Straße 57 79283 Bollschweil / DE | |||
05 /
KOLTAY, Peter Tannebergstraße 10a 79117 Freiburg / DE | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Landaubogen 1-3 81373 München / DE | [2020/08] | Application number, filing date | 18716316.7 | 13.04.2018 | [2020/08] | WO2018EP59601 | Priority number, date | LU20170100170 | 13.04.2017 Original published format: LU 100170 | [2020/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018189397 | Date: | 18.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3609995 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3609995 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/32, C12M1/00, C12M1/26, C12M1/34, B01L3/00 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
C12M23/12 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12M33/04 (EP,IL,KR);
B01F23/23121 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B01F23/23123 (EP,IL);
B01F31/651 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B01F33/813 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B01L3/0293 (EP,IL);
B01L3/5025 (IL,KR);
C12M23/38 (EP,IL,KR);
C12M41/26 (EP,IL,KR);
C12M41/32 (EP,IL,KR);
C12M41/34 (EP,IL,KR);
C12M41/44 (EP,IL,KR);
C12M41/46 (EP,IL,KR);
B01F2101/23 (IL,US);
B01L2200/028 (IL,KR);
B01L2200/0647 (IL,KR);
B01L2200/14 (IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM PROZESSIEREN EINER FLÜSSIGEN PROBE | [2020/08] | English: | METHOD FOR PROCESSING A LIQUID SAMPLE | [2020/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UN ÉCHANTILLON LIQUIDE | [2020/08] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 11.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.04.2018 | AL | 25.11.2020 | CY | 25.11.2020 | CZ | 25.11.2020 | EE | 25.11.2020 | FI | 25.11.2020 | HR | 25.11.2020 | LT | 25.11.2020 | LV | 25.11.2020 | MC | 25.11.2020 | MK | 25.11.2020 | MT | 25.11.2020 | PL | 25.11.2020 | RO | 25.11.2020 | RS | 25.11.2020 | SI | 25.11.2020 | SK | 25.11.2020 | SM | 25.11.2020 | BG | 25.02.2021 | NO | 25.02.2021 | GR | 26.02.2021 | IS | 25.03.2021 | PT | 25.03.2021 | LU | 13.04.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 13.04.2018 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
MK | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 13.04.2018 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 25.11.2020 | |
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 25.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2956931 (SIDNEY GOLDBERG) [A] 1,18,31 * column 1, lines 54-60 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5839828 (GLANVILLE ROBERT W [US]) [Y] 26 * column 1, lines 9-25 * * column 2, lines 39-63 * * column 3, lines 16-27 *; | [A]DE19742163 (HERING STEFFEN DR SC MED [AT]) [A] 1,18,31 * column 1, lines 45-48; figure a10 *; | [XY]WO02072423 (BIOMICRO SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-13,16-20,22-25,27-29,31-37,40 * pages 1,6 * * page 8, line 24 - page 9, line 30 * * page 10, lines 5-14 * * page 12 - page 13 * * figure - * [Y] 21,38,39; | [XY]DE102006030068 (M2P LABS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,8-15,18,19,22,24,25,28,31-36,38-40 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0006] , [0017] - [0019] - [0029] - [0032] * * figures 15,16 * [Y] 21,26; | [A]WO2011140071 (INTEGRA BIOSCIENCES CORP FORMERLY VIAFLO CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,18,31 * paragraphs [0006] - [0022] * * figure - *; | [Y]US2012149603 (COONEY CHRISTOPHER G [US], et al) [Y] 21 * paragraph [0034]; figure 2 *; | [A]WO2013019212 (NANO3D BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [A] 1,18,31* paragraphs [0018] - [0045] *; | [XY]EP2927312 (BIONEER CORP [KR]) [X] 1-4,8-13,16-19,25,27,28,30-35,40 * paragraphs [0024] , [0030] , [0038] , [0039] , [0045]; figure 1 * [Y] 21,38,39 |