EP3600055 - X-RAY IMAGING SYSTEMS WITH MULTIPOSITION COLLIMATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/06] | MULTIPOSITION COLLIMATION DEVICE AND X-RAY IMAGING SYSTEMS | ||
[2022/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dentsply Sirona Inc. 221 W. Philadelphia Street Suite 60W York, PA 17401 / US | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABRAMOVICH, Mark c/o Dentsply Sirona Inc. 221 West Philadelphia Street Suite 60W York, PA 17401 / US | 02 /
BRATSLAVSKY, Aaron c/o Dentsply Sirona Inc. 221 West Philadelphia Street Suite 60W York, PA 17401 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Charles c/o Dentsply Sirona Inc. 221 West Philadelphia Street Suite 60W York, PA 17401 / US | 04 /
MANDELKEM, Stan c/o Dentsply Sirona Inc. 221 West Philadelphia Street Suite 60W York, PA 17401 / US | 05 /
HWANG, Liang c/o Dentsply Sirona Inc. 221 West Philadelphia Street Suite 60W York, PA 17401 / US | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Özer, Alpdeniz Sirona Dental Systems GmbH Corporate Legal Fabrikstraße 31 64625 Bensheim / DE | [2022/37] |
Former [2020/06] | Özer, Alpdeniz Dentsply Sirona Legal IP Department Fabrikstraße 31 64625 Bensheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 18716749.9 | 20.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018US23345 | Priority number, date | US201715463325 | 20.03.2017 Original published format: US201715463325 | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018175428 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3600055 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3600055 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/14, A61B6/06, A61B6/08, A61B6/02, A61B6/00, G21K1/04 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
A61B6/06 (EP,US);
A61B6/025 (EP,US);
A61B6/08 (EP,US);
A61B6/42 (US);
A61B6/4429 (US);
A61B6/4452 (EP,US);
A61B6/51 (US);
A61B6/512 (EP,US);
A61B6/547 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÖNTGENBILDGEBUNGSSYSTEME MIT MEHRPOSITIONSKOLLIMATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/18] | English: | X-RAY IMAGING SYSTEMS WITH MULTIPOSITION COLLIMATION DEVICE | [2022/18] | French: | SYSTÈMES D'IMAGERIE À RAYONS X AVEC DISPOSITIF DE COLLIMATION À POSITIONS MULTIPLES | [2022/18] |
Former [2020/06] | MEHRPOSITIONSKOLLIMATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND RÖNTGENBILDGEBUNGSSYSTEME | ||
Former [2020/06] | MULTIPOSITION COLLIMATION DEVICE AND X-RAY IMAGING SYSTEMS | ||
Former [2020/06] | DISPOSITIF DE COLLIMATION À POSITIONS MULTIPLES ET SYSTÈMES D'IMAGERIE À RAYONS X | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 18.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.09.2022 | AT | 14.09.2022 | CZ | 14.09.2022 | DK | 14.09.2022 | EE | 14.09.2022 | ES | 14.09.2022 | HR | 14.09.2022 | LT | 14.09.2022 | LV | 14.09.2022 | MC | 14.09.2022 | NL | 14.09.2022 | PL | 14.09.2022 | RO | 14.09.2022 | RS | 14.09.2022 | SE | 14.09.2022 | SI | 14.09.2022 | SK | 14.09.2022 | SM | 14.09.2022 | NO | 14.12.2022 | GR | 15.12.2022 | IS | 14.01.2023 | PT | 16.01.2023 | GB | 20.03.2023 | IE | 20.03.2023 | LU | 20.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | [2024/12] |
Former [2024/09] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
GB | 20.03.2023 | ||
IE | 20.03.2023 | ||
LU | 20.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
GB | 20.03.2023 | ||
IE | 20.03.2023 | ||
LU | 20.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
LU | 20.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | HR | 14.09.2022 | |
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | HR | 14.09.2022 | |
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | LT | 14.09.2022 | |
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | LT | 14.09.2022 | |
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2014010349 (DE GODZINSKY CHRISTIAN [FI], et al); | [XY]US2014226793 (ELVIN RICHARD H [US], et al); | [Y]US2015004558 (INGLESE JEAN-MARC [FR], et al); | [XY]US9144410 (CHEN ADAM [US], et al); | [XY]US2016038105 (HAYMAN ROBERT [US], et al); | [Y]US2016287198 (ABRAMOVICH MARK [US], et al); | [XP]WO2017196413 (XINTEK INC [US]) |