EP3609644 - INVERSE-TURNING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ventura Mecanics SA Rue du Verger 9 2014 Bôle / CH | [2020/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DROZ, Fabrice Rue de la Printanière 30 2720 Tramelan / CH | 02 /
DE MONTE, Pierino Rue du Büttenberg 33 2504 Bienne / CH | 03 /
LOEHR, Bernard Crêt Tacconet 12 a 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 04 /
NOVO, David Chemin des Vignes 13 2013 Colombier / CH | [2020/10] |
Former [2020/08] | 01 /
DROZ, Fabrice Rue du Plan 4 2720 Tramelan / CH | ||
02 /
DE MONTE, Pierino Rue du Büttenberg 33 2504 Bienne / CH | |||
03 /
LOEHR, Bernard Crêt Tacconet 12 a 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | |||
04 /
NOVO, David Chemin des Vignes 13 2013 Colombier / CH | Representative(s) | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2020/08] | Application number, filing date | 18717133.5 | 29.03.2018 | [2020/08] | WO2018IB52206 | Priority number, date | CH20170000489 | 11.04.2017 Original published format: CH 4892017 | [2020/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018189612 | Date: | 18.10.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3609644 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3609644 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B23B3/26, B23B7/02 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
B23B3/26 (EP);
B23B29/24 (EP);
B23B7/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UMGEKEHRT DREHENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2020/08] | English: | INVERSE-TURNING MACHINE | [2020/08] | French: | MACHINE DE TOURNAGE INVERSÉ | [2020/08] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 19.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 09.11.2022 | AT | 09.11.2022 | CZ | 09.11.2022 | DK | 09.11.2022 | EE | 09.11.2022 | ES | 09.11.2022 | FI | 09.11.2022 | HR | 09.11.2022 | IT | 09.11.2022 | LT | 09.11.2022 | LV | 09.11.2022 | MC | 09.11.2022 | NL | 09.11.2022 | PL | 09.11.2022 | RO | 09.11.2022 | RS | 09.11.2022 | SE | 09.11.2022 | SI | 09.11.2022 | SK | 09.11.2022 | SM | 09.11.2022 | NO | 09.02.2023 | GR | 10.02.2023 | IS | 09.03.2023 | PT | 09.03.2023 | IE | 29.03.2023 | LU | 29.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/12] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
IE | 29.03.2023 | ||
LU | 29.03.2023 | ||
BE | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
IE | 29.03.2023 | ||
LU | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
LU | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 09.11.2022 | |
NO | 09.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1913377 (SAUTER RICHARD) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS5570510 (KUBOTA LTD) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]WO9114527 (ESCO SA [CH]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]DE19921919 (SCHUEBEL ENGINEERING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * column 1, lines 3-6 * * column 5, lines 54-61 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]CH696741 (LON GINE PREC INDUSTRY CO LTD [TW]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102011009794 (SMS MEER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | CH327038 | FR1578355 | EP0278898 | WO2009000094 | WO2015124222 |