EP3548846 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR NAVIGATING WITH SENSING UNCERTAINTY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mobileye Vision Technologies Ltd. 13 Hartom Street P.O.B. 45157, Har Hotzvim Jerusalem 9777513 / IL | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHALEV-SHWARTZ, Shai c/o Mobileye Vision Technologies Ltd. 13 Hartom Street P.O.B. 45157 Har Hotzvim 9777513 Jerusalem / IL | 02 /
SHAMMAH, Shaked c/o Mobileye Vision Technologies Ltd. 13 Hartom Street P.O.B. 45157 Har Hotzvim 9777513 Jerusalem / IL | 03 /
SHASHUA, Amnon c/o Mobileye Vision Technologies Ltd. 13 Hartom Street P.O.B. 45157 Har Hotzvim 9777513 Jerusalem / IL | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [2019/41] | Application number, filing date | 18717414.9 | 01.03.2018 | [2019/41] | WO2018IB00341 | Priority number, date | US201762465301P | 01.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762465301 P | [2019/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018158642 | Date: | 07.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3548846 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3548846 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/36, G08G1/16, G06K9/00, G05D1/02, B60W30/08, G06K9/62 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
G01C21/3602 (EP,KR,US);
B60W60/00276 (US);
B60W30/0956 (KR,US);
B60W60/00274 (US);
G05D1/0231 (US);
G05D1/0257 (US);
G05D1/0278 (US);
G05D1/247 (US);
G05D1/248 (US);
G05D1/249 (US);
G06F18/29 (EP,KR);
G06V10/84 (EP,KR,US);
G06V20/56 (EP,KR,US);
G08G1/16 (EP,KR);
B60W2420/403 (US);
B60W2420/408 (US);
B60W2552/53 (US);
B60W2554/00 (KR,US);
B60W2554/20 (US);
B60W2554/4029 (US);
B60W2554/4041 (US);
B60W2554/4045 (US);
B60W2554/60 (US);
B60W2554/802 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/41] | G01C21/36, B60W30/08, G05D1/02, G06K9/00, G08G1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR NAVIGATION MIT ERFASSUNG VON UNSICHERHEIT | [2019/41] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR NAVIGATING WITH SENSING UNCERTAINTY | [2019/41] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE NAVIGATION AVEC UNE INCERTITUDE DE DÉTECTION | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 04.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.10.2021 | 05.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.04.2022 | AT | 13.04.2022 | CZ | 13.04.2022 | DK | 13.04.2022 | EE | 13.04.2022 | ES | 13.04.2022 | FI | 13.04.2022 | HR | 13.04.2022 | IT | 13.04.2022 | LT | 13.04.2022 | LV | 13.04.2022 | MC | 13.04.2022 | PL | 13.04.2022 | RO | 13.04.2022 | RS | 13.04.2022 | SE | 13.04.2022 | SI | 13.04.2022 | SK | 13.04.2022 | SM | 13.04.2022 | BG | 13.07.2022 | NO | 13.07.2022 | GR | 14.07.2022 | IS | 13.08.2022 | PT | 16.08.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/48] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2015151725 (CLARKE ANNA [IL], et al) | by applicant | US9168868 |