Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP3602733

Designated contracting statesAL 
 ATLapse: 03.01.2024
 BELapse: 31.03.2024
 BGLapse: 03.01.2024
 CHLapse: 31.03.2024
CY 
 CZLapse: 03.01.2024
 DE 
 DKLapse: 03.01.2024
 EELapse: 03.01.2024
 ESLapse: 03.01.2024
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 04.04.2024
 HRLapse: 03.01.2024
 HU 
 IELapse: 29.03.2024
 ISLapse: 03.05.2024
 ITLapse: 03.01.2024
 LI 
 LTLapse: 03.01.2024
 LULapse: 29.03.2024
 LVLapse: 03.01.2024
 MCLapse: 03.01.2024
 MK 
 MT 
 NLLapse: 03.01.2024
 NOLapse: 03.04.2024
 PLLapse: 03.01.2024
 PTLapse: 03.05.2024
 ROLapse: 03.01.2024
 RSLapse: 03.04.2024
 SELapse: 03.01.2024
 SILapse: 03.01.2024
 SKLapse: 03.01.2024
 SMLapse: 03.01.2024
 TR 
Validation statesKH 
 MA 
 MD 
TN 
Examination procedure29.11.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase24.10.2019National basic fee paid 
24.10.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
24.10.2019Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
09.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
16.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted03.01.2024
Opposition procedure07.10.2024No opposition filed within time limit published on 11.12.2024 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.02.2020 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Validation States:BA ME
 
Event date:05.02.2020 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:05.02.2020 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20191024
 
Event date:08.07.2020 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED)
 
Event date:08.07.2020 
Event description:REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED)
 
Event date:03.01.2020 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:03.01.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE
 
Event date:06.10.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: UNKNOWN
 
Event date:22.07.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS
 
Event date:25.08.2021 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20210721
 
Event date:20.07.2023 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:20.07.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED
 
Event date:02.08.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H02J 13/00 20060101AFI20230629BHEP
 
Event date:02.08.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H02J 1/14 20060101ALI20230629BHEP
 
Event date:02.08.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H02H 7/26 20060101ALI20230629BHEP
 
Event date:02.08.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04W 52/02 20090101ALI20230629BHEP
 
Event date:02.08.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01R 19/165 20060101ALN20230629BHEP
 
Event date:16.08.2023 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20230721
 
Event date:29.11.2023 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3
 
Event date:01.12.2023 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:01.12.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED
 
Event date:27.12.2023 
Event description:OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED
Effective DATE:20231121
 
Event date:03.01.2024 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:03.01.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:15.01.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:18.01.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602018063568 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:31.01.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:25.04.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT MG9D
Code Expl.:-INVALIDATION OF EXTENSION OF EUROPEAN PATENTS
 
Event date:26.04.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:30.04.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20240208
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.04.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:30.04.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20240126
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:08.05.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MP
Code Expl.:-PATENT INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:31.05.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20240119
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:15.06.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK05 1647792 AT T
Code Expl.:-DELETION ACC. TO PAR. 5 (WITHDRAWAL OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT)
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:27.06.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:01.07.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240503
 
Event date:28.06.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:09.07.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:15.07.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240404
 
Event date:18.07.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:18.07.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240403
 
Event date:23.07.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:23.07.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:31.07.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:31.07.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:31.07.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:31.07.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240404
 
Event date:31.07.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:31.07.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240503
 
Event date:31.07.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:31.07.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240403
 
Event date:31.07.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240403
 
Event date:01.08.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240503
 
Event date:01.08.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:30.08.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:30.08.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:30.08.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240503
 
Event date:30.08.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:11.10.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:14.10.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SM
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:23.10.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:29.10.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:31.10.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:31.10.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:31.10.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:31.10.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:31.10.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SM
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:31.10.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:08.11.2024 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261
 
Event date:08.11.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
 
Event date:18.11.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20240329
 
Event date:20.11.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:07.10.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602018063568 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:29.11.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20240329
 
Event date:29.11.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:04.12.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:11.12.2024 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20241007
 
Event date:31.12.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103
 
Event date:16.01.2025 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20240331
 
Event date:16.12.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE MM
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20240331
 
Event date:24.01.2025 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20240329
 
Event date:31.01.2025 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20240331
 
Event date:31.01.2025 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20240331
 
Event date:31.01.2025 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20240329
 
Event date:24.04.2025 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20240103