EP3601268 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF 6-(CYCLOPROPANEAMIDO)-4-((2-METHOXY-3-(1-METHYL-1H-1,2,4-TRIAZOL-3-YL)PHENYL)AMINO)-N-(METHYL-D3)PYRIDAZINE-3-CARBOXAMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [2021/11] |
Former [2020/06] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Ke 42 South Drive East Brunswick New Jersey 08816 / US | 02 /
DEERBERG, Joerg 11 Irongate Ct. Columbus New Jersey 08022 / US | 03 /
LIN, Dong c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton New Jersey 08543 / US | 04 /
DUMMELDINGER, Michael c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton New Jersey 08543 / US | 05 /
INANKUR, Bahar c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton New Jersey 08543 / US | 06 /
KOLOTUCHIN, Sergei V. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton New Jersey 08543 / US | 07 /
LI, Jun c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton New Jersey 08543 / US | 08 /
ROGERS, Amanda J. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton New Jersey 08543 / US | 09 /
ROSSO, Victor W. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton New Jersey 08543 / US | 10 /
SIMMONS, Eric M. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton New Jersey 08543 / US | 11 /
SOUMEILLANT, Maxime C. D. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton New Jersey 08543 / US | 12 /
TREITLER, Daniel S. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton New Jersey 08543 / US | 13 /
WANG, Jianji 9 Aster Way Dayton New Jersey 08810 / US | 14 /
ZHENG, Bin c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route206 and Province Line Road Princeton New Jersey 08543 / US | 15 /
SMITH, Michael J. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton New Jersey 08543 / US | 16 /
STROTMAN, Neil A. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton New Jersey 08543 / US | 17 /
TYMONKO, Steven 577 Oxford Ln Lindenhurst Illinois 60046 / US | 18 /
BENKOVICS, Tamas 7 Vincent Court East Brunswick New Jersey 08816 / US | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2021/11] |
Former [2020/06] | Kling, Edouard Swords Laboratories, Ireland Swiss Branch, Steinhausen Hinterbergstrasse 16 6312 Steinhausen / CH | Application number, filing date | 18718340.5 | 29.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018US25100 | Priority number, date | US201762478789P | 30.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762478789 P | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018183649 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3601268 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3601268 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/12, A61K31/501, A61P29/00 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
C07D249/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D403/12 (CN,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61P29/00 (EA,IL,KR);
A61K31/501 (KR);
A61P37/00 (KR);
C07B59/00 (EP);
C07C209/00 (EP,CN);
C07C209/62 (CN);
C07C211/04 (CN);
C07C211/09 (US);
C07C231/08 (EP);
C07C233/90 (CN);
C07C241/02 (KR);
C07C243/28 (KR);
C07C303/28 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C209/00, C07C211/04 (CN,EP);
C07C209/62, C07C211/04 (CN);
C07C231/08, C07C233/03 (EP);
C07C303/28, C07C309/73 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 6-(CYCLOPROPANAMIDO)-4-((2-METHOXY-3-(1-METHYL-1H-1,2,4-TRIAZOL-3-YL)PHENYL)AMINO)-N-(METHYL-D3)PYRIDAZIN-3-CARBOXAMID | [2020/06] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF 6-(CYCLOPROPANEAMIDO)-4-((2-METHOXY-3-(1-METHYL-1H-1,2,4-TRIAZOL-3-YL)PHENYL)AMINO)-N-(METHYL-D3)PYRIDAZINE-3-CARBOXAMIDE | [2020/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE 6-(CYCLOPROPANEAMIDO)-4-((2-MÉTHOXY-3-(1-MÉTHYL-1H-1,2,4-TRIAZOL-3-YL) PHÉNYL)AMINO)-N-(MÉTHYL-D3)PYRIDAZINE-3-CARBOXAMIDE | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 12.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21155321.9 / EP3882237 | EP23209227.0 | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDA]US9505748 (MOSLIN RYAN M [US], et al) [XD] 12 * column 4, lines 33-36; example 52 in columns 102-103; *[A] 1,2,8,9,11 | by applicant | US9505748 |