EP3609674 - ADAPTABLE BLOW MOLD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2020/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GELTINGER, Florian Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2020/08] | Representative(s) | Bittner, Bernhard Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Prüfeninger Strasse 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [2020/08] | Application number, filing date | 18718773.7 | 12.04.2018 | [2020/08] | WO2018EP59402 | Priority number, date | DE201710107950 | 12.04.2017 Original published format: DE102017107950 | [2020/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018189300 | Date: | 18.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3609674 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3609674 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/48, B29C49/06 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
B29C49/48 (EP,US);
B29C2049/4858 (EP,US);
B29C2049/4892 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C49/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANPASSBARE BLASFORM | [2020/08] | English: | ADAPTABLE BLOW MOLD | [2020/08] | French: | MOULE DE SOUFFLAGE PERSONNALISABLE | [2020/08] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 08.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22174188.7 / EP4063101 | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.07.2022 | CZ | 13.07.2022 | DK | 13.07.2022 | EE | 13.07.2022 | ES | 13.07.2022 | FI | 13.07.2022 | HR | 13.07.2022 | LT | 13.07.2022 | LV | 13.07.2022 | MC | 13.07.2022 | NL | 13.07.2022 | PL | 13.07.2022 | RO | 13.07.2022 | RS | 13.07.2022 | SE | 13.07.2022 | SI | 13.07.2022 | SK | 13.07.2022 | SM | 13.07.2022 | NO | 13.10.2022 | GR | 14.10.2022 | IS | 13.11.2022 | PT | 14.11.2022 | AT | 12.04.2023 | GB | 12.04.2023 | IE | 12.04.2023 | LU | 12.04.2023 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2023 | ||
IE | 12.04.2023 | ||
LU | 12.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2023 | ||
LU | 12.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2023 | ||
LU | 12.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 12.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 13.07.2022 | |
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 13.07.2022 | |
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 13.07.2022 | |
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 13.07.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008181982 (LANE MICHAEL T [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [XI]US2012161349 (PASQUIER HERVE [FR], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0090]; figure 3; claim 1 * [I] 2-11; | [A]US2015306828 (GELTINGER FLORIAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [XI]US2015343696 (GELTINGER FLORIAN [DE], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0065]; figures 9-10 * [I] 2-11 | Examination | US2014004219 | US2015132430 |