EP3606941 - NOVEL DEPSIPEPTIDES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novobiotic Pharmaceuticals, LLC 767c Concord Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUGHES, Dallas 74 Golden Run Road Bolton, Massachusetts 01740 / US | 02 /
SPOERING, Amy 429 Main Street Waltham, MA 02452-6135 / US | 03 /
PEOPLES, Aaron, J. 807 Somerville Avenue Apt. 3 Somerville, MA 02143 / US | 04 /
LING, Losee, Lucy 131 Gloucester Street Arlington, MA 02476 / US | 05 /
NITTI, Anthony 993 Massachusetts Avenue Lexington, MA 02420 / US | 06 /
MILLETT, William 33 Alvarado Avenue Apt. 1F Worcester, MA 01604 / US | 07 /
ZULLO, Ashley 767C Concord Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 08 /
LEWIS, Kim 49 Glendale Road Newton, MA 02459 / US | 09 /
EPSTEIN, Slava 135 Bonham Road Dedham, MA 02026 / US | 10 /
DESROSIERS, Alysha 15 Piggott Road Apt. 3 Medford, MA 02155 / US | 11 /
ACHORN, Catherine 13 Glenwood Avenue Apt. 2 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 12 /
DEMEO, Kelly 1731 Beacon Street Apt. 315 Brookline, MA 02445 / US | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2024/18] |
Former [2020/07] | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18719001.2 | 30.03.2018 | [2020/07] | WO2018US25365 | Priority number, date | US201762481412P | 04.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762481412 P | [2020/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018187173 | Date: | 11.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3606941 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3606941 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07K11/02, C07K7/06, C07K7/56, A61K38/00 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
C07K11/02 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP,US);
C07K7/06 (EP);
C07K7/56 (EP);
C12N1/20 (US);
A61K38/00 (US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Extension states | BA | 04.11.2019 | ME | 04.11.2019 | Validation states | KH | 04.11.2019 | MA | 04.11.2019 | MD | 04.11.2019 | TN | 04.11.2019 | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE DEPSIPEPTIDE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2020/07] | English: | NOVEL DEPSIPEPTIDES AND USES THEREOF | [2020/07] | French: | NOUVEAUX DEPSIPEPTIDES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2020/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 04.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2014089053 (NOVOBIOTIC PHARMACEUTICALS LLC [US]); | by applicant | US5607400 | US5893842 | US5899889 | WO9945985 | US5989227 | US6142976 | WO03077976 | US6792743 | US6807797 | US2004267194 | US2005075611 | WO2005032627 | US7041087 | US2006129108 | US7081107 | US2007092487 | US2007161961 | WO2008094984 |