EP3616013 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING FILM PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Windmöller & Hölscher KG Münsterstrasse 50 49525 Lengerich / DE | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACKMANN, Martin Münsterstraße 50 49525 Lengerich / DE | 02 /
BUSSMANN, Markus Münsterstr. 50 49525 Lengerich / DE | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Bals & Vogel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Konrad-Zuse-Str. 4 44801 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/10] | Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142 44799 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 18719537.5 | 20.04.2018 | [2020/10] | WO2018EP60189 | Priority number, date | DE201710108924 | 26.04.2017 Original published format: DE102017108924 | [2020/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018197358 | Date: | 01.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3616013 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418, B29C47/92 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
G05B19/41875 (EP,US);
B29C48/92 (EP,US);
G05B2219/32018 (US);
G05B2219/32184 (US);
G05B2219/32189 (US);
G05B2219/34457 (US);
Y02P90/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONTROLLE EINER FOLIENPRODUKTION | [2020/10] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING FILM PRODUCTION | [2020/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE D'UNE PRODUCTION DE FEUILLES | [2020/10] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 26.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE10300375 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE]) [X] 1-5,8,9,17,20 * the whole document * [I] 10,18,19,21; | [XI]EP2392446 (BATTENFELD CINCINNATI GERMANY [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,8,9,17,20 * the whole document *[I] 10,18,19,21; | [XI]US2016009014 (SCHMITZ TORSTEN [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,11-17,20 * the whole document * [I] 10,18,19,21; | [I] - Door Chunling Du, Lihua Xie, Modeling and Control of Vibration in Mechanical Systems, CRC Press, (20100416), pages 86 - 86, ISBN 9781439817988, XP002782809 [I] 1,17,20 * page 86 - page 86 * | [I] - Eugene Lavretsky, "Advanced Topics in Systems and Control: Adaptive Control, Lecture 3", (20100416), pages 23 - 31, URL: http://www.cds.caltech.edu/archive/help/cms1312.html?op=wiki&wiki_op=view&id=237, (20180705), XP002782810 [I] 1,17,20 * page 25 - page 26 * |