EP3612826 - ANALYTE MEASUREMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lifescan Scotland Limited Beechwood Park North Inverness IV2 3ED / GB | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALECHA, Michael An Caorann Corry Road Muir of Ord IV6 7TL / GB | 02 /
MCNEILAGE, Alan Beechwood Park North Inverness Inverness-shire IV2 3ED / GB | 03 /
STEELE, Dominic Beechwood Park North Inverness Inverness-shire IV2 3ED / GB | 04 /
ZVIKHACHEVSKAYA, Anna F.16 Queensgate Apartments 6 Queensgate Street Inverness Inverness-shire IV1 1DA / GB | [2020/09] | Representative(s) | Brunner, John Michael Owen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2020/09] | Application number, filing date | 18719820.5 | 19.04.2018 | [2020/09] | WO2018EP59991 | Priority number, date | US201715492226 | 20.04.2017 Original published format: US201715492226 | [2020/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018193017 | Date: | 25.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3612826 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/327, A61B5/145 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
G01N27/327 (US);
G01N27/307 (US);
G01N27/3277 (EP,US);
G01N33/48707 (EP,US);
G01N33/49 (EP,US);
G01N33/5438 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Title | German: | ANALYTMESSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2020/09] | English: | ANALYTE MEASUREMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2020/09] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE D'ANALYTE | [2020/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 20.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/50] | 15.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2020/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012283538 (ROSE JEFFERSON [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0129] ** figure 4 *; | [A]US2014083868 (ZVIKHACHEVSKAYA ANNA [GB], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0093] * * figure 7 *; | [A]US2014090989 (MALECHA MICHAEL [GB]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0116] * * figures 6, 7 *; | [A]US2015076009 (MCNEILAGE ALAN [GB], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]AU2014218413B (ASCENSIA DIABETES CARE HOLDINGS AG [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0136] - paragraph [0150] * * figure 6D * |