EP3607592 - METHOD FOR OPERATING AN ULTRASONIC MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Physik Instrumente (PI) GmbH & Co. KG Auf der Römerstraße 1 76228 Karlsruhe / DE | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WISCHNEWSKIY, Wladimir Friedensstraße 14 14712 Rathenow / DE | 02 /
WISCHNEWSKI, Alexej Robert-Koch-Straße 10 76744 Wörth / DE | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/07] | Application number, filing date | 18720088.6 | 04.04.2018 | [2020/07] | WO2018DE100301 | Priority number, date | DE201710107275 | 05.04.2017 Original published format: DE102017107275 | [2020/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018184634 | Date: | 11.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3607592 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/04, H02N2/00, H02N2/02, H02N2/10 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
H02N2/0075 (EP,US);
H10N30/871 (US);
H02N2/004 (EP,US);
H10N30/2023 (US);
H02N2/026 (EP,US);
H02N2/103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES ULTRASCHALLMOTORS | [2020/07] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING AN ULTRASONIC MOTOR | [2020/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN MOTEUR À ULTRASONS | [2020/07] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 19.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |