EP3614923 - SEPARATION BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sarstedt Aktiengesellschaft & Co. KG Sarstedtstraße 1 51588 Nümbrecht / DE | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEINSTOCK, Mark Im Heiter 8 57612 Helmenzen / DE | 02 /
WEGENER, Christian Goldnesselweg 2 51588 Nümbrecht / DE | 03 /
KARRENBERG, Ulrich Erlinghagener Straße 32 51709 Marienheide / DE | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Wolf-Dietrich Rüdiger Gihske Grosse Klüppel Kross Bürogemeinschaft von Patentanwälten Hammerstrasse 3 57072 Siegen / DE | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 18721020.8 | 25.04.2018 | [2020/10] | WO2018EP60602 | Priority number, date | DE201710108937 | 26.04.2017 Original published format: DE102017108937 | [2020/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018197565 | Date: | 01.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3614923 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3614923 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/15, B01L3/00, B01D21/26, G01N33/49 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
B01L3/50215 (EP,US);
A61B5/15 (RU);
B01D17/12 (RU);
G01N33/491 (EP,US);
A61B5/15003 (EP);
A61B5/150755 (EP,US);
B01D21/262 (US);
B01D21/307 (US);
B01D2221/10 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRENNKÖRPER | [2020/10] | English: | SEPARATION BODY | [2020/10] | French: | CORPS DE SÉPARATION | [2020/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 28.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.08.2020 | Observations by third parties | 29.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2018 | AL | 30.03.2022 | CY | 30.03.2022 | CZ | 30.03.2022 | EE | 30.03.2022 | FI | 30.03.2022 | HR | 30.03.2022 | LT | 30.03.2022 | LV | 30.03.2022 | MC | 30.03.2022 | MK | 30.03.2022 | RO | 30.03.2022 | RS | 30.03.2022 | SI | 30.03.2022 | SK | 30.03.2022 | SM | 30.03.2022 | TR | 30.03.2022 | IE | 25.04.2022 | LU | 25.04.2022 | BG | 30.06.2022 | NO | 30.06.2022 | GR | 01.07.2022 | IS | 30.07.2022 | PT | 01.08.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 25.04.2018 | |
AL | 30.03.2022 | ||
CY | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
MK | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.04.2022 | ||
LU | 25.04.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
CY | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
MK | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.04.2022 | ||
LU | 25.04.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
CY | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.04.2022 | ||
LU | 25.04.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.04.2022 | ||
LU | 25.04.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.04.2022 | ||
IT | 25.04.2022 | ||
LU | 25.04.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.04.2022 | ||
LU | 25.04.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
LU | 25.04.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | CZ | 30.03.2022 | |
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 30.03.2022 | |
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 30.03.2022 | |
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 30.03.2022 | |
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 30.03.2022 | |
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 30.03.2022 | |
NO | 30.06.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0098150 (WELLS JOHN RAYMOND) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0753741 (NIIGATA ENGINEERING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * figures 15-17 * * page 11, line 3 - page 13, line 21 *; | [A]US5632905 (HAYNES JOHN L [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 56 - column 6, line 10 * * figure - *; | [A]JPH09222427 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * figures 2,8 *; | [A]US6280400 (NIERMANN VOLKER [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 45 * * figures 5-8 *; | [A]WO2010132783 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US], et al) [A] 1-10* abstract * | by applicant | US5632905 | DE60023823T | DE69931584T | WO2010132783 | WO2016076911 |