|
04.11.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2024 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.11.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.08.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.08.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
03.08.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
22.06.2023 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.06.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.06.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.06.2023 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.06.2023 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.06.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2023 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2023 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2023 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.05.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.05.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.05.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.05.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.05.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.05.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.05.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.05.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.05.2023 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.05.2023 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.05.2023 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.05.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2023 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
30.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2023 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.01.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.02.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.02.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.02.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.11.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
19.11.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.05.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.05.2020 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.05.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.05.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2020 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2019 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.12.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.09.2019 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
08.11.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2018 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
06.07.2018 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
17.05.2018 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
30 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Fee calculation sheet for an international application |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Notification Concerning Documents Transmitted (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |