EP3624632 - HOLDER FOR RECEIVING AND OPERATING TABLET PCS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität Chemnitz Strasse der Nationen 62 09111 Chemnitz / DE | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WÄCHTER, Michael Weststraße 86 09116 Chemnitz / DE | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Rumrich, Gabriele Patentanwältin Limbacher Strasse 305 09116 Chemnitz / DE | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 18721945.6 | 13.04.2018 | [2020/13] | WO2018DE100352 | Priority number, date | DE201720102713U | 08.05.2017 Original published format: DE 202017102713 U | [2020/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018206040 | Date: | 15.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3624632 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A45F5/00, A63F13/98, H04B1/3888, G06F1/16, H04M1/04 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
G06F1/1626 (EP);
A45F5/00 (EP);
A63F13/24 (EP);
A63F13/92 (EP);
A63F13/98 (EP);
G06F1/1632 (EP);
G06F1/169 (EP);
H04B1/3888 (EP);
A45F2200/0525 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | HALTERUNG ZUR AUFNAHME UND BEDIENUNG VON TABLET-PC | [2020/13] | English: | HOLDER FOR RECEIVING AND OPERATING TABLET PCS | [2020/13] | French: | SUPPORT DESTINÉ À LA RÉCEPTION ET À LA COMMANDE D'UNE TABLETTE PC | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/13] | 17.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 17.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/01] | 31.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/01] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 11.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 11.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.02.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 11.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 11.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.02.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 11.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 11.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.02.2020 | Decision despatched | 11.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 11.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.02.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |