EP3619867 - SEARCH SPACE AND CONFIGURATION FOR SHORT TRANSMISSION TIME INTERVAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2020/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLANO ARENAS, John, Camilo Herzogstr. 79 40215 Dusseldorf / DE | 02 /
ANDGART, Niklas Femmötesvägen 48 24733 Södra Sandby / SE | 03 /
FALCONETTI, Laetitia Nybodavägen 8 17761 Järfälla / SE | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2020/11] | Application number, filing date | 18722054.6 | 04.05.2018 | [2020/11] | WO2018EP61603 | Priority number, date | US201762502471P | 05.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762502471 P | [2020/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018202893 | Date: | 08.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3619867 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN);
H04W72/231 (CN);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04L5/0005 (US);
H04L5/0091 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] | Title | German: | SUCHRAUM UND KONFIGURATION FÜR KURZÜBERTRAGUNGSZEITINTERVALL | [2020/11] | English: | SEARCH SPACE AND CONFIGURATION FOR SHORT TRANSMISSION TIME INTERVAL | [2020/11] | French: | ESPACE DE RECHERCHE ET CONFIGURATION POUR INTERVALLE DE TEMPS DE TRANSMISSION COURT | [2020/11] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/11] | 29.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.07.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 28.07.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.08.2022 | Decision despatched | 21.09.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 21.09.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.10.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI] - ZTE ET AL, "sPDCCH design for short TTI", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20170403 - 20170407, (20170402), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1704640 SPDCCH DESIGN FOR SHORT TTI, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170402), XP051242779 [X] 1,2,4-11,13,15-17,19-26,28,30,31,33-41,43,45-53,55,56 * page 1 - page 8 * [I] 3,12,14,18,27,29,32,42,44,54 | [I] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Discussion on sPDCCH design", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20170403 - 20170407, (20170402), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1704264, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170402), XP051242416 [I] 1-56 * section 4 * | [A] - MOTOROLA MOBILITY ET AL, "Control signalling for shortened TTI", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20170403 - 20170407, (20170402), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1705545_CONTROL SIGNALLING FOR STTI_V0, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170402), XP051243673 [A] 1-56 * page 2 * |