09.02.2024 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
18.11.2023 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
28.10.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
07.06.2023 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.09.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.06.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.06.2022 |
First examination report |
|
03.06.2022 |
Change - applicant |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
26.04.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.06.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
26.06.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
22.04.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
24.01.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
24.01.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
02.01.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.11.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.10.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.10.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
25.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|