EP3612617 - BITUMEN SOLID AT AMBIENT TEMPERATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TotalEnergies OneTech La Défense 6 2 Place Jean Millier 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2022/27] |
Former [2020/09] | For all designated states Total Marketing Services 24 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUNG, Yvong 62 rue Villeroy 69003 Lyon / FR | [2020/09] | Representative(s) | Pact-IP 37, rue Royale 92210 Saint-Cloud / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/09] | Corizzi, Valérie PACT-IP 37, rue Royale 92210 Saint-Cloud / FR | Application number, filing date | 18722688.1 | 18.04.2018 | [2020/09] | WO2018FR50974 | Priority number, date | FR20170053475 | 21.04.2017 Original published format: FR 1753475 | [2020/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018193211 | Date: | 25.10.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3612617 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C10C3/14, B29B9/16, E01C7/18, E01C7/22, C08L95/00 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
C10C3/14 (EP);
C08L95/00 (EP,US);
E01C7/18 (EP);
E01C7/22 (US)
| C-Set: |
C08L95/00, C08K3/34, C08L71/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Title | German: | BEI RAUMTEMPERATUR FESTES BITUMEN | [2020/09] | English: | BITUMEN SOLID AT AMBIENT TEMPERATURE | [2020/09] | French: | BITUME SOLIDE A TEMPERATURE AMBIANTE | [2020/09] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 25.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/11] | 17.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]US2004209082 (LEE WILLY W [US], et al) [YD] 1-18 * paragraphs [0001] , [0026] *; | [A]US2011233105 (BAILEY WILLIAM R [US]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0010] , [0027] *; | [A]US8491985 (KALKANOGLU HUSNU M [US], et al) [A] 1-18* column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 4 *; | [YD]WO2016198782 (TOTAL MARKETING SERVICES [FR]) [YD] 1-18 * claims 1-17 * | by applicant | US3026568 | US4279579 | EP0199475 | US5236503 | WO9714753 | WO0153409 | EP1328607 | EP1407814 | EP1432778 | US2004209082 | EP1473327 | EP1783174 | WO2007058994 | WO2008137394 | WO2009150519 | WO2009153324 | WO2010055491 | WO2011013073 | WO2012168380 | WO2016016318 | WO2016198782 |