EP3791439 - A WAVEGUIDE SECTION COMPRISING WAVEGUIDE TUBES WITH PLUG-IN FILTER DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2023/48] |
Former [2021/11] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELENIV, Anatoli Krokslätts Parkgata 60 431 68 Mölndal / SE | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2023/48] |
Former [2021/11] | Valea AB Box 7086 103 87 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 18724206.0 | 08.05.2018 | [2021/11] | WO2018EP61936 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019214816 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3791439 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3791439 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01P1/202, H01P1/207 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
H01P1/202 (EP,US);
H01P1/207 (EP,US);
H01P3/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WELLENLEITERABSCHNITT MIT WELLENLEITERROHREN MIT STECKFILTERVORRICHTUNGEN | [2021/11] | English: | A WAVEGUIDE SECTION COMPRISING WAVEGUIDE TUBES WITH PLUG-IN FILTER DEVICES | [2021/11] | French: | SECTION DE GUIDE D'ONDES COMPRENANT DES TUBES DE GUIDE D'ONDES DOTÉS DE DISPOSITIFS DE FILTRE ENFICHABLE | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 07.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2023 | CZ | 29.11.2023 | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | IT | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | PT | 01.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2931992 (FRANK CAROSELLI) [Y] 9,27 * column 3, line 14 - line 33; figure 1 *; | [A]US6255920 (OHWADA TETSU [JP], et al) [A] 1-33 * column 1, line 12 - line 64; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2006082426 (LO HINE TONG DOMINIQUE [FR], et al) [Y] 9,16,18,19,23,27 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-3 *; | [XAYI]KR101016744B (INNERTRON INC [KR]) [X] 1-4,8,10,14,15,17,22,24-26,28,32,33 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0010]; figure 1 * [A] 5-7,11-13,29-31 [Y] 9,16,18,19,23,27 [I] 20,21; | [A]US2015214616 (ROGERS SHAWN D [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0048]; figure 1 *; | [A] - CHI WANG ET AL, "Dual-Mode Conductor-Loaded Cavity Filters", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, PLENUM, USA, (19970801), vol. 45, no. 8, ISSN 0018-9480, XP011036933 [A] 1-33 * abstract * |