EP3634794 - MOTOR VEHICLE WITH A DEVICE FOR VENTILATING A REAR ROW OF SEATS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/16] | DEVICE FOR VENTILATING A REAR ROW OF SEATS IN A MOTOR VEHICLE | ||
[2022/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIL, Michael Forsthausweg 1 85661 Forstinning / DE | 02 /
ROTH, Irina Birkenweg 13 85640 Putzbrunn / DE | [2020/16] | Application number, filing date | 18724499.1 | 03.05.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018EP61397 | Priority number, date | DE201710209505 | 06.06.2017 Original published format: DE102017209505 | [2020/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018224219 | Date: | 13.12.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3634794 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3634794 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/24, B60H1/34 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
B60H1/246 (EP);
B60H1/3407 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRAFTFAHRZEUG MIT EINER VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE BELÜFTUNG EINER HINTEREN SITZREIHE | [2022/44] | English: | MOTOR VEHICLE WITH A DEVICE FOR VENTILATING A REAR ROW OF SEATS | [2022/44] | French: | VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE AVEC UN DISPOSITIF DE VENTILATION D'UNE RANGÉE DE SIÈGES ARRIÈRE | [2022/44] |
Former [2020/16] | VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE BELÜFTUNG EINER HINTEREN SITZREIHE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | ||
Former [2020/16] | DEVICE FOR VENTILATING A REAR ROW OF SEATS IN A MOTOR VEHICLE | ||
Former [2020/16] | DISPOSITIF DE VENTILATION D'UNE RANGÉE DE SIÈGES ARRIÈRE D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 16.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 22.02.2023 | DK | 22.02.2023 | EE | 22.02.2023 | ES | 22.02.2023 | FI | 22.02.2023 | HR | 22.02.2023 | IT | 22.02.2023 | LT | 22.02.2023 | LV | 22.02.2023 | MC | 22.02.2023 | NL | 22.02.2023 | PL | 22.02.2023 | RO | 22.02.2023 | RS | 22.02.2023 | SE | 22.02.2023 | SI | 22.02.2023 | SK | 22.02.2023 | SM | 22.02.2023 | AT | 03.05.2023 | IE | 03.05.2023 | LU | 03.05.2023 | NO | 22.05.2023 | GR | 23.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | IS | 22.06.2023 | PT | 22.06.2023 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
IT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
IE | 03.05.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
BE | 31.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | CZ | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
IE | 03.05.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
BE | 31.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | CZ | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
IE | 03.05.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | CZ | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | CZ | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | DK | 22.02.2023 | |
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | DK | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2234268 (MCCOLLUM HENRY J DE N) [I] 1-9 * column 3, line 8 - column 6, line 2; figures 1-7 *; | [I]US2336089 (GOULD RICHARD E) [I] 1-9* column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 66; figures 1-5 *; | [XI]EP0425721 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,7 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 27; figures 1-2 * [I] 2-6,8,9 |