EP3609428 - PACKAGING SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MOUNTING A TOOL ON A SURGICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAKO Surgical Corp. 3365 Enterprise Ave. Weston, FL 33331 / US | [2024/02] |
Former [2020/08] | For all designated states MAKO Surgical Corp. 2555 Davie Road Fort Lauderdale, FL 33317 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOLONEY, Michael Ballynoran Carrick-on-Suir County Tipperary E32 YT27 / IE | 02 /
GILHOOLEY, Séamus Belleville Lodge Athenry Galway / IE | 03 /
STAUNTON, Douglas A. 5390 Glen Harbor Drive Kalamazoo, MI 49009 / US | [2020/17] |
Former [2020/08] | 01 /
MOLONEY, Michael 24 Riverlane Abbeyside Dungarvan / IE | ||
02 /
GILHOOLEY, Séamus Belleville Lodge Athenry Galway / IE | |||
03 /
STAUNTON, Douglas A. 5390 Glen Harbor Drive Kalamazoo, MI 49009 / US | Representative(s) | Röthinger, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/08] | Röthinger, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18725028.7 | 11.04.2018 | [2020/08] | WO2018US27138 | Priority number, date | US201762484547P | 12.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762484547 P | [2020/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018191396 | Date: | 18.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3609428 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3609428 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B50/30, A61B50/20, A61B50/00 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
A61B50/30 (EP,US);
A61B17/3215 (US);
A61B50/20 (EP,US);
A61B50/3001 (EP,US);
B65D75/366 (US);
A61B2017/00526 (US);
A61B2050/005 (EP,US);
A61B2050/0057 (EP,US);
A61B2050/0068 (US);
A61B2050/0083 (EP,US);
A61B2050/3008 (EP,US);
A61B2050/314 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINES WERKZEUGS AUF EINER CHIRURGISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2020/08] | English: | PACKAGING SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MOUNTING A TOOL ON A SURGICAL DEVICE | [2020/08] | French: | SYSTÈMES D'EMBALLAGE ET PROCÉDÉS DE MONTAGE D'UN OUTIL SUR UN DISPOSITIF CHIRURGICAL | [2020/08] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 06.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2022 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 17.02.2022 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 23.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2024 | BG | 24.01.2024 | ES | 24.01.2024 | FI | 24.01.2024 | HR | 24.01.2024 | LT | 24.01.2024 | LV | 24.01.2024 | NL | 24.01.2024 | PL | 24.01.2024 | SE | 24.01.2024 | NO | 24.04.2024 | RS | 24.04.2024 | GR | 25.04.2024 | IS | 24.05.2024 | PT | 24.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
LV | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
PL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
PT | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 24.01.2024 | |
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 24.01.2024 | |
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 24.01.2024 | |
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 24.01.2024 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4519501 (CERWIN ROBERT J [US]); | [XI]US2014251846 (ROESLER PETER [DE]) | Examination | US2013299371 |