EP3630472 - ARTIFICAL EYE LENS WITH DIFFRACTIVE GRATING STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ARTIFICIAL EYE LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Meditec AG Göschwitzer Strasse 51-52 07745 Jena / DE | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASCHKE, Michael Wiesenweg 20 73447 Oberkochen / DE | 02 /
DICK, Manfred Birkenweg 9 07926 Gefell / DE | 03 /
GERLACH, Mario Hattwichstra e 87 16548 Glienicke-Nordbahn / DE | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei PartG mbB Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | [2020/15] | Application number, filing date | 18725507.0 | 17.05.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018EP62920 | Priority number, date | DE201710112086 | 01.06.2017 Original published format: DE102017112086 | [2020/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018219669 | Date: | 06.12.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3630472 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3630472 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B29D11/02, A61F2/16, G02C7/02 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
B29D11/023 (EP,US);
A61F2/1654 (US);
A61F2/1613 (EP);
A61F2002/0081 (US);
A61F2002/1683 (US);
A61F2002/1689 (US);
A61F2240/001 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜNSTLICHE AUGENLINSE MIT DIFFRAKTIVER GITTERSTRUKTUR SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER KÜNSTLICHEN AUGENLINSE | [2020/15] | English: | ARTIFICAL EYE LENS WITH DIFFRACTIVE GRATING STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ARTIFICIAL EYE LENS | [2020/15] | French: | CRISTALLIN ARTIFICIEL À STRUCTURE DE RÉSEAU DE DIFFRACTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CRISTALLIN ARTIFICIEL | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 22.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4976732 (VOROSMARTHY [US]); | [A]US5100226 (FREEMAN MICHAEL H [GB]); | [A]US2013268071 (VILUPURU ABHIRAM S [US], et al); | [XAI]US2015073549 (WEBB R KYLE [US], et al); | [A]US2015378065 (KNOX WAYNE H [US], et al); | [A]US2016135947 (WEBB R KYLE [US], et al) | by applicant | US2004032566 | US2010082017 | US2014135920 |