EP3618813 - IMPROVED EXTENDED RELEASE HIGHLY LOADED DRUG COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lubrizol Advanced Materials, Inc. 9911 Brecksville Road Cleveland, OH 44141-3247 / US | [2020/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIINEA, Liliana A. 9911 Brecksville Road Cleveland, Ohio 44141-3247 / US | 02 /
DRAGANOIU, Elena S. 3700 Steeles Avenue West Suite 201 Vaughan, Ontario L4L 8K8 / CA | 03 /
CHIKHALIKAR, Kedar V. Application and Business Center 6th & 7th Floor Jaswanti Landmark Mehra Industrial Estate, LBS Marg, Vikhroli Mumbai 400 079 / IN | 04 /
CHADAWAR, Vikrant V. Application and Business Center 6th & 7th Floor Jaswanti Landmark Mehra Industrial Estate, LBS Marg, Vikhroli Mumbai 400 079 / IN | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2020/11] | Application number, filing date | 18725989.0 | 01.05.2018 | [2020/11] | WO2018US30380 | Priority number, date | US201762500078P | 02.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762500078 P | [2020/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018204317 | Date: | 08.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3618813 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3618813 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K31/138, A61K31/155, A61K31/4015 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
A61K9/2027 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/155 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4015 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4458 (KR);
A61K31/616 (KR);
A61K9/2009 (KR);
A61K9/2054 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE WIRKSTOFFZUBEREITUNG MIT VERLANGSAMTER FREISETZUNG UND HOHER BELADUNG | [2022/03] | English: | IMPROVED EXTENDED RELEASE HIGHLY LOADED DRUG COMPOSITIONS | [2020/11] | French: | COMPOSITION AMELIOREE FORTEMENT CHARGEE AVEC UNE LIBERATION PROLONGEE | [2022/03] |
Former [2020/11] | VERBESSERTE HOCHBELADENE ARZNEIZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VERLÄNGERTER FREISETZUNG | ||
Former [2020/11] | COMPOSITIONS DE MÉDICAMENT HAUTEMENT CHARGÉES À LIBÉRATION PROLONGÉE AMÉLIORÉES | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/11] | 18.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.07.2022 | AT | 06.07.2022 | CZ | 06.07.2022 | DK | 06.07.2022 | EE | 06.07.2022 | FI | 06.07.2022 | HR | 06.07.2022 | IT | 06.07.2022 | LT | 06.07.2022 | LV | 06.07.2022 | MC | 06.07.2022 | NL | 06.07.2022 | PL | 06.07.2022 | RO | 06.07.2022 | RS | 06.07.2022 | SE | 06.07.2022 | SI | 06.07.2022 | SK | 06.07.2022 | SM | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.10.2022 | GR | 07.10.2022 | IS | 06.11.2022 | PT | 07.11.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 06.07.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB831897 (BRISTOL MYERS CO) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US4664915 (SIMONIAN HOVSEP [US]) [A] 1-16* claims 1-6 *; | [A]WO2004069234 (IPCA LAB LTD [IN], et al) [A] 1-16 * claim - *; | [A]WO2006082523 (AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD [IN], et al) [A] 1-16 * claim - *; | [X]WO2007002516 (SPHERICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1843761 (ALEMBIC LTD [IN]) [A] 1-16 * claim - * | Examination | EP1843761 | by applicant | US2798053 | US3915921 | US4267103 | US5288814 | US5349030 |