EP3624641 - GUIDE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Revocation of patent | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schock Metallwerk GmbH Siemensstrasse 1-3 73660 Urbach / DE | [2023/02] |
Former [2020/13] | For all designated states Schock Metallwerk GmbH Siemensstrasse 1-3 73660 Urbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIMMERMANN, Joachim Astrid-Lindgren-Weg 4/1 73614 Schorndorf / DE | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Brienner Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/02] | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB Marstallstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2020/13] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 18726133.4 | 18.05.2018 | [2020/13] | WO2018EP63103 | Priority number, date | DE201710208450 | 18.05.2017 Original published format: DE102017208450 | [2020/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018211078 | Date: | 22.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3624641 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3624641 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/487, B60R7/04, A47B88/453, B60N2/75, A47B88/473, A47B88/457, B60N2/07, B60N2/02 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
A47B88/487 (EP,US);
A47B88/437 (US);
A47B88/457 (EP,US);
A47B88/473 (EP,US);
B60N2/02246 (US);
B60N2/02253 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/13] | English: | GUIDE DEVICE | [2020/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 19.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.10.2023
22.02.2024
WITHDRAWN Accuride International GmbH Werner-von-Siemens-Strasse 16-18 65582 Diez/Lahn / DE Opponent's representative WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2024/14] |
Former [2023/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.10.2023
11.10.2023
ADMISSIBLE Accuride International GmbH Werner-von-Siemens-Strasse 16-18 65582 Diez/Lahn / DE Opponent's representative WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | 26.10.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.04.2024 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2024/36] | 30.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 11.01.2023 | DK | 11.01.2023 | EE | 11.01.2023 | FI | 11.01.2023 | HR | 11.01.2023 | LT | 11.01.2023 | LV | 11.01.2023 | MC | 11.01.2023 | PL | 11.01.2023 | RO | 11.01.2023 | RS | 11.01.2023 | SE | 11.01.2023 | SI | 11.01.2023 | SK | 11.01.2023 | SM | 11.01.2023 | NO | 11.04.2023 | GR | 12.04.2023 | IS | 11.05.2023 | PT | 11.05.2023 | IE | 18.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/11] | CZ | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SI | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | CZ | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | DK | 11.01.2023 | |
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | DK | 11.01.2023 | |
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | FI | 11.01.2023 | |
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 11.01.2023 | |
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 11.01.2023 | |
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 11.01.2023 | |
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 11.01.2023 | |
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 11.01.2023 | |
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 11.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE10105756 (FULTERER GMBH LUSTENAU [AT]) [X] 1-7,9-11 * figure 1 *; | [X]DE20118300U (REUM GMBH & CO BETRIEBS KG [DE]) [X] 1,3-7,11,14,15 * figure 6 ** claim 9 *; | [X]WO03049577 (APPLIED DESIGN & ENG LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-11 * figures 52,62,70 *; | [X]DE202004007109U (GRASS GMBH HOECHST [AT]) [X] 1-8,10,11 * figures 1,7,10 *; | [X]WO2011030473 (TOYOTA AUTO BODY CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-13 * figures 2-3 *; | [X]WO2015096889 (GRASS GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-3,5-9,11,12 * figure 11 * * page 16, lines 17-23 * | Examination | US6629738 | US6971729 | EP1659248 | KR20070054298 | US7815267 | Opposition | DE29701359U | DE10105756 | WO2007017688 | DE102008023246 | DE102012100202 |