EP3642716 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A VEHICLE MODULE DEPENDING ON A STATUS SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Löwentaler Strasse 20 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARI, B lent Lise-Meitner-Strasse 3 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | ZF Friedrichshafen AG Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz Löwentalerstraße 20 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2020/18] | Application number, filing date | 18726394.2 | 15.05.2018 | [2020/18] | WO2018EP62497 | Priority number, date | DE201710210151 | 19.06.2017 Original published format: DE102017210151 | [2020/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018233935 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3642716 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/07, G06F11/16, G06F11/20 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
G06F11/1641 (EP);
B60W50/023 (EP,US);
B60W50/0205 (US);
G06F11/0739 (EP);
G06F11/0757 (EP,US);
G06F11/2028 (EP,US);
G06F11/2038 (EP);
G06N3/04 (US);
B60W2050/021 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANSTEUERUNG EINES FAHRZEUGMODULS IN ABHÄNGIGKEIT EINES ZUSTANDSSIGNALS | [2020/18] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A VEHICLE MODULE DEPENDING ON A STATUS SIGNAL | [2020/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN MODULE DE VÉHICULE EN FONCTION D'UN SIGNAL D'ÉTAT | [2020/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 26.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/33] | 12.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE19527323 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 17 * abstract *; | [A]DE102009054637 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 11,13 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0025] ** paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0051] *; | [IY]DE102011011755 (CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC [DE]) [I] 1,22 * abstract * * figure 2 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0047] * [Y] 8; | [XYI]DE102012205731 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6,10,20-22 * abstract * * figures 1,4,6 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0095] * [Y] 3,7-9,17-19,23,24 [I] 9; | [Y]DE102013221577 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [Y] 9,14,15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0048] *; | [Y]DE102014220925 (CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC [DE]) [Y] 3,7,18,19,24 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] *; | [XYI]EP3085596 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) [X] 11,12,16 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0048] * [Y] 14,15,23 [I] 13-15,23 |