EP3607597 - GLASS-BASED BATTERY SEPARATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VITRULAN Textile Glass GmbH Bernecker Strasse 8 95509 Marktschorgast / DE | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZETTL, Heiko Fraunhoferstrasse 25 95448 Bayreuth / DE | 02 /
GERDES, Thorsten Geranienstraße 11 95488 Eckersdorf / DE | 03 /
SCHADECK, Ulrich Roter Weiher 19 92637 Weiden (i. d. OPf.) - Rothenstadt / DE | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2020/07] | Application number, filing date | 18726724.0 | 03.04.2018 | [2020/07] | WO2018EP58434 | Priority number, date | DE201710205653 | 03.04.2017 Original published format: DE102017205653 | [2020/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018185075 | Date: | 11.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3607597 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3607597 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/403, H01M50/44, H01M50/446, H01M50/449, H01M50/437, H01M50/489, H01M50/491, H01M10/0525 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
H01M50/44 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M50/403 (EP,US);
H01M50/437 (EP,US);
H01M50/446 (EP);
H01M50/449 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/07] | H01M2/14, H01M2/16, H01M10/0525 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLASBASIERTER BATTERIESEPARATOR | [2020/07] | English: | GLASS-BASED BATTERY SEPARATOR | [2020/07] | French: | SÉPARATEUR À BASE DE VERRE | [2020/07] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 20.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 13.12.2023 | ES | 13.12.2023 | HR | 13.12.2023 | PL | 13.12.2023 | RO | 13.12.2023 | RS | 13.12.2023 | SK | 13.12.2023 | SM | 13.12.2023 | NO | 13.03.2024 | GR | 14.03.2024 | IS | 13.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 13.12.2023 | |
ES | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RO | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 14.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2013045350 (SCHOTT AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-16 * paragraphs [0058] , [0 59] *; | [XI]EP2605311 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-11,13-16 * paragraphs [0051] - [0063]; example 1; table 1 * [I] 12; | [AD]WO2016210225 (DARAMIC LLC [US]) [AD] 1-16* abstract * | by applicant | US5468572 | DE10347566 | US2008124559 | WO2010149265 | DE102011003186 | WO2013045350 | US2013157109 | WO2014047126 | WO2016210225 |