blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3607606

EP3607606 - POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.08.2020
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.10.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Energy AS
Oestre Aker Vei 88
0596 Oslo / NO
[2021/08]
Former [2020/07]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MOEN, Stian Skorstad
Oeverfossveien 44
7081 Sjetnemarka / NO
02 / SKJETNE, Arve
Nardovegen 15A
7032 Trondheim / NO
 [2020/07]
Representative(s)Roth, Thomas, et al
Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2020/07]Maier, Daniel Oliver
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date18726913.929.03.2018
[2020/07]
WO2018EP58145
Priority number, dateGB2017000552005.04.2017         Original published format: GB 201705520
GB2017000551305.04.2017         Original published format: GB 201705513
[2020/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018185000
Date:11.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3607606
Date:12.02.2020
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2020/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.10.2018
ClassificationIPC:H01M10/42, H01M10/48, H02J7/00, H01M10/6567
[2020/07]
CPC:
H01M10/4257 (EP,KR,US); H01M10/482 (EP,KR,US); H01M10/486 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/613 (EP,KR,US); H01M10/625 (EP,KR); H01M10/654 (EP,KR);
H01M10/6555 (EP,KR); H01M10/6557 (EP,KR); H01M10/6567 (EP,KR,US);
H02J1/10 (EP,KR,US); H02J50/80 (KR,US); H02J7/0013 (EP,KR,US);
H02J7/0014 (EP,KR,US); H02J7/0047 (EP,KR,US); H02J7/1423 (EP,KR);
H01M10/6556 (US); H01M2010/4271 (EP,KR,US); H01M2220/20 (EP,KR,US);
H02J2310/40 (EP,US); H02J2310/42 (EP,KR,US); H02J2310/44 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (KR) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/07]
TitleGerman:STROMVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM[2020/07]
English:POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM[2020/07]
French:SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE[2020/07]
Entry into regional phase12.08.2019National basic fee paid 
12.08.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.08.2019Examination requested  [2020/07]
12.08.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.05.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.08.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.02.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.06.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 07
25.03.2025Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2012061262  (NAVITAS SOLUTIONS [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041]; figures 4,6,8 *;
 [X]US2014035365  (YOO HWAN-SUNG [KR]) [X] 1,2,5-9 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043] ** paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0055]; figures 2,3,4 *;
 [XA]WO2016121644  (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-9 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0027]; figure 1 * [A] 3,4
ExaminationUS6208117
 WO2010118039
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.