EP3635407 - METHODS FOR AIDING IN THE HYPERACUTE DIAGNOSIS AND DETERMINATION OF TRAUMATIC BRAIN INJURY USING EARLY BIOMARKERS ON AT LEAST TWO SAMPLES FROM THE SAME HUMAN SUBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064 / US | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCQUISTON, Beth c/o Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park Illinois 60064 / US | 02 /
ROGERS, Justin c/o Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park Illinois 60064 / US | 03 /
DATWYLER, Saul c/o Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park Illinois 60064 / US | 04 /
MARINO, Jaime c/o Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park Illinois 60064 / US | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/16] | Chapman, Desmond Mark, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18727084.8 | 26.04.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018US29585 | Priority number, date | US201762491600P | 28.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762491600 P | [2020/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018200823 | Date: | 01.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3635407 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
G01N33/6896 (EP,US);
G01N33/573 (US);
A61B6/032 (US);
A61B6/501 (US);
G01N2333/46 (US);
G01N2333/916 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DER HYPERAKUTEN DIAGNOSE UND BESTIMMUNG VON TRAUMATISCHER HIRNVERLETZUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON FRÜHBIOMARKERN AUF MINDESTENS ZWEI PROBEN AUS DEM GLEICHEN MENSCHLICHEN PATIENTEN | [2020/16] | English: | METHODS FOR AIDING IN THE HYPERACUTE DIAGNOSIS AND DETERMINATION OF TRAUMATIC BRAIN INJURY USING EARLY BIOMARKERS ON AT LEAST TWO SAMPLES FROM THE SAME HUMAN SUBJECT | [2020/16] | French: | MÉTHODES D'AIDE AU DIAGNOSTIC ET À LA DÉTERMINATION HYPERAIGUS D'UNE LÉSION CÉRÉBRALE TRAUMATIQUE AU MOYEN DE BIOMARQUEURS PRÉCOCES SUR AU MOINS DEUX ÉCHANTILLONS PROVENANT DU MÊME SUJET HUMAIN | [2020/16] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 28.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.06.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 07.06.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.06.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2010148391 (BANYAN BIOMARKERS INC [US], et al); | [I]WO2015066211 (BANYAN BIOMARKERS INC [US]); | [IP]WO2018067468 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | [IP]WO2018067474 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | by applicant | US4554101 | US4704692 | US4816567 | US4873316 | WO9002809 | US4946778 | EP0404097 | US5006309 | WO9110741 | WO9110737 | US5063081 | WO9117271 | WO9201047 | US5089424 | WO9202551 | WO9209690 | WO9215679 | WO9218619 | WO9220791 | WO9222324 | WO9301288 | WO9311161 | WO9311236 | US5223409 | US5225539 | US5241070 | US5258498 | WO9402602 | US5294404 | US5304489 | US5352803 | US5359093 | US5403484 | WO9515982 | US5427908 | WO9520401 | US5468646 | US5480792 | US5496925 | US5516637 | US5525524 | US5530101 | US5543524 | US5565362 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | US5571698 | US5573904 | US5580717 | US5585089 | US5593896 | US5627052 | US5658727 | US5679526 | US5693762 | US5698426 | US5714352 | US5723323 | US5733743 | WO9816654 | US5750753 | US5763192 | WO9824893 | US5766886 | US5770429 | US5780225 | US5783699 | WO9831700 | US5814476 | US5817483 | US5821047 | US5824514 | US5824799 | US5827690 | US5833985 | WO9850433 | US5837243 | US5849992 | US5851776 | US5885527 | US5916771 | US5922845 | US5922615 | US5939598 | US5939272 | US5947124 | WO9945031 | US5969108 | WO9953049 | US5976862 | US5985615 | US5985579 | US5994616 | US5998209 | US6017517 | US6019944 | WO0009560 | US6075181 | WO0037504 | US6091001 | US6096311 | US6111166 | US6114598 | US6113855 | WO0056772 | US6130364 | US6143576 | US6180370 | US6204023 | US6270765 | WO0158956 | US6303755 | WO0202773 | US6410690 | US2003170881 | US2003186374 | US6632926 | US6682928 | US2004018577 | US6699658 | US2005054078 | US6914128 | US6984720 | US2006134713 | US2006160164 | WO2007024715 | US7612181 | WO2016161402 | WO2016161400 |