EP3616436 - PACKET DATA CONVERGE PROTOCOL PROTOCOL DATA UNIT PRE-PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 222 W. Merchandise Mart Plaza Suite 1800 Chicago, IL 60654 / US | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOEHR, Joachim Paracelsusweg 28 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | 02 /
BASU MALLICK, Prateek Steubenstrasse 192 63225 Langen / DE | 03 /
KUCHIBHOTLA, Ravi 32 Tuttle Avenue Clarendon Hills, Illinois 60514 / US | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 18727086.3 | 26.04.2018 | [2020/10] | WO2018US29595 | Priority number, date | US201715498314 | 26.04.2017 Original published format: US201715498314 | [2020/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018200831 | Date: | 01.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3616436 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/06, H04W28/08, H04W72/14 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
H04W28/0205 (EP,KR,US);
H04W28/082 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/32 (KR);
H04L69/324 (US);
H04W28/0252 (EP,KR,US);
H04W28/065 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Title | German: | VORVERARBEITUNG VON PROTOKOLLDATENEINHEITEN EINES PAKETDATENKONVERGENZPROTOKOLLS | [2020/10] | English: | PACKET DATA CONVERGE PROTOCOL PROTOCOL DATA UNIT PRE-PROCESSING | [2020/10] | French: | PRÉTRAITEMENT D'UNITÉ DE DONNÉES DE PROTOCOLE DE PROTOCOLE DE CONVERGENCE DE DONNÉES PAR PAQUETS | [2020/10] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 22.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.09.2023 | 30.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2010017467 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al); |