EP3619949 - CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION-REFERENCE SIGNAL, CSI-RS, ACQUISITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2020/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGARAJA, Sumeeth 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
LUO, Tao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
AKKARAKARAN, Sony 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
MANOLAKOS, Alexandros 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [2020/11] | Application number, filing date | 18727505.2 | 04.05.2018 | [2020/11] | WO2018US31186 | Priority number, date | US201762502353P | 05.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762502353 P | US201815970816 | 03.05.2018 Original published format: US201815970816 | [2020/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018204846 | Date: | 08.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3619949 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
H04L5/005 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0057 (US);
H04L5/0092 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0098 (US);
H04W36/0072 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] | Title | German: | ERFASSUNG VON KANALZUSTANDSINFORMATIONSREFERENZSIGNAL, CSI-RS | [2020/11] | English: | CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION-REFERENCE SIGNAL, CSI-RS, ACQUISITION | [2020/11] | French: | ACQUISITION DE SIGNAL DE RÉFÉRENCE D'INFORMATIONS D'ÉTAT DE CANAL, CSI-RS | [2020/11] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/11] | 03.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2014079025 (BROADCOM CORP [US], et al); | [Y]WO2017022902 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [XP]WO2018075985 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); |