EP3625595 - SUPPRESSING NOISES IN SEISMIC DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saudi Arabian Oil Company 1 Eastern Avenue Dhahran 31311 / SA | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIN, Fuhao P. O. Box 8011 Dhahran 31311 / SA | 02 /
TSINGAS, Constantinos P.O. Box 1397 Dhahran 31311 / SA | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/13] | Conroy, John Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18727638.1 | 15.05.2018 | [2020/13] | WO2018US32728 | Priority number, date | US201715597861 | 17.05.2017 Original published format: US201715597861 | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018213283 | Date: | 22.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3625595 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/36 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
G01V1/364 (EP,US);
G01V1/362 (US);
G01V2210/24 (EP,US);
G01V2210/242 (EP,US);
G01V2210/3246 (EP,US);
G01V2210/512 (US);
G01V2210/514 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | RAUSCHUNTERDRÜCKUNG BEI SEISMISCHEN DATEN | [2020/13] | English: | SUPPRESSING NOISES IN SEISMIC DATA | [2020/13] | French: | SUPPRESSION DE BRUITS DANS DES DONNÉES SISMIQUES | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 27.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/51] | 31.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US4992995 (FAVRET PAUL D [US]) [X] 1,4-6 * figures 1-8,11,12 * * column 1, line 5 - line 39 * * column 2, line 6 - line 66 * * column 3, line 35 - column 6, line 5 * [Y] 2,3,7,9,10,14,16,17 [I] 8,11-13,15,18-20; | [XYI] - FUHAO QIN ET AL, "Extraction of Geological Information From Seismic Data Contaminated By Coherent Noise", SPE MIDDLE EAST OIL & GAS SHOW AND CONFERENCE, 6-9 MARCH, MANAMA, KINGDOM OF BAHRAIN, (20170309), doi:10.2118/183830-MS, ISBN 978-1-61399-504-4, pages 1 - 5, XP055498084 [X] 1-7 * page 1 - page 4 * [Y] 2,3,7,9,10,14,16,17 [I] 8-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2118/183830-MS | [XYI] - STEPHEN K. CHIU, "Coherent and random noise attenuation via multichannel singular spectrum analysis in the randomized domain : Coherent and random noise attenuation in the randomized domain", GEOPHYSICAL PROSPECTING, (20120719), vol. 61, no. s1, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2478.2012.01090.x, ISSN 0016-8025, pages 1 - 9, XP055498338 [X] 1-7 * abstract * * page 3 - page 9 * [Y] 2,3,7,9,10,14,16,17 [I] 8-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2478.2012.01090.x | [XYI] - CHARLES SICKING ET AL, "Multiples attenuation using trace randomization and empirical mode decomposition", SEG TECHNICAL PROGRAM EXPANDED ABSTRACTS 2016, (20161017), doi:10.1190/segam2016-13771915.1, pages 4498 - 4502, XP055498114 [X] 1,4-6 * page 4498 - page 4501 * [Y] 2,3,7,9,10,14,16,17 [I] 8,11-13,15,18-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1190/segam2016-13771915.1 |