EP3619959 - UNIFIED ACCESS CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2020/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OZTURK, Ozcan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
CHAPONNIERE, Lenaig Genevieve 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
HORN, Gavin Bernard 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
GRIOT, Miguel 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2022/15] |
Former [2020/11] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18727933.6 | 04.05.2018 | [2020/11] | WO2018US31187 | Priority number, date | US201762502661P | 06.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762502661 P | US201815970712 | 03.05.2018 Original published format: US201815970712 | [2020/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018208613 | Date: | 15.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3619959 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3619959 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/10, H04W48/02, // H04W48/08, H04W48/12 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
H04W48/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04W48/10 (EP,KR);
H04W48/08 (EP,US);
H04W48/12 (EP,US);
H04W84/042 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/11] | H04W48/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINHEITLICHE ZUGANGSSTEUERUNG | [2020/11] | English: | UNIFIED ACCESS CONTROL | [2020/11] | French: | CONTRÔLE D'ACCÈS UNIFIÉ | [2020/11] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/11] | 21.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.05.2018 | AL | 13.04.2022 | AT | 13.04.2022 | CY | 13.04.2022 | CZ | 13.04.2022 | DK | 13.04.2022 | EE | 13.04.2022 | ES | 13.04.2022 | FI | 13.04.2022 | HR | 13.04.2022 | IT | 13.04.2022 | LT | 13.04.2022 | LV | 13.04.2022 | MC | 13.04.2022 | MK | 13.04.2022 | MT | 13.04.2022 | PL | 13.04.2022 | RO | 13.04.2022 | RS | 13.04.2022 | SE | 13.04.2022 | SI | 13.04.2022 | SK | 13.04.2022 | SM | 13.04.2022 | TR | 13.04.2022 | IE | 04.05.2022 | LU | 04.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | CH | 31.05.2022 | LI | 31.05.2022 | BG | 13.07.2022 | NO | 13.07.2022 | GR | 14.07.2022 | IS | 13.08.2022 | PT | 16.08.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 04.05.2018 | |
AL | 13.04.2022 | ||
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CY | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
MK | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
TR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IE | 04.05.2022 | ||
LU | 04.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 04.05.2018 | |
AL | 13.04.2022 | ||
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CY | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
MK | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
IE | 04.05.2022 | ||
LU | 04.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CY | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
MK | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
IE | 04.05.2022 | ||
LU | 04.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CY | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
IE | 04.05.2022 | ||
LU | 04.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
IE | 04.05.2022 | ||
LU | 04.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
IE | 04.05.2022 | ||
LU | 04.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
IE | 04.05.2022 | ||
LU | 04.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
LU | 04.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
LU | 04.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
LU | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Access Control in NR", vol. RAN WG2, no. Spokane, USA; 20170403 - 20170407, (20170403), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1702622, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170403), XP051244624 [X] 1-4,7-13,15-18,20-26,28,29 * Chapter 2.1, 2.2 * [I] 5,6,14,19,27 | [X] - MEDIATEK INC, "Introduction of unified access control", vol. SA WG2, no. Busan, Korea; 20170327 - 20170331, (20170326), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-171890 PCR 23.501 ACCESS CONTROL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/SA2/Docs/, (20170326), XP051247627 [X] 1,15,28,29 * the whole document * | [XI] - LG ELECTRONICS INC, "Unified access control mechanism for New RAT", vol. RAN WG2, no. Athens, Greece; 20170213 - 20170217, (20170212), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1701637 UNIFIED ACCESS CONTROL MECHANISM FOR NEW RAT, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FR, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170212), XP051212231 [X] 1,15,28,29 * the whole document * [I] 2-14,16-27 | [XI] - MEDIATEK INC, "Unified Access Control", vol. SA WG2, no. Busan, Korea; 20170327 - 20170331, (20170326), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-171888 UNIFIED ACCESS CONTROL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/SA2/Docs/, (20170326), XP051247625 [X] 1,15,28,29 * the whole document * [I] 2-14,16-27 | [I] - "Access category based access barring mechanism", vol. RAN WG2, no. Spokane, USA; 20170403 - 20170407, (20170403), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1703338 ACCESS CATEGORY BASED ACCESS BARRING MECHANISM, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ;, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170403), XP051245210 [I] 1-29 * the whole document * |