|
20.09.2023 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2022 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2022 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2022 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.10.2022 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.10.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.08.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
93 |
|
18.08.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
93 |
|
31.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
31.03.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
31.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2021 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2021 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.02.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.02.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.10.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.10.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2020 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2020 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.06.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
17.06.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2020 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2020 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
26.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2019 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.10.2019 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.01.2019 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
85 |
|
06.12.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.12.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.12.2018 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
92 |
|
03.08.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
03.08.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.08.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
01.06.2018 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
28.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
8 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
83 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |